Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SANA RANI vs. STEPHEN GUTOWSKI
An Appeal - District Court Motion case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Harford County. Judge Yolanda L. Curtin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 05, 2022
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2022
Filing Location
Harford County, MD
Filing Court House
Harford County
Judge
Category
Appeal - District Court Motion
Practice Area
Appeals
Matter Type
General Appeals
Status
Open
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney Appearance - $20 Fee | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Appearance - $20 Fee Entry of Appearance |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Curtin, Yolanda L. |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service Order Granting Continuance |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDERED, that the Motion for Continuance/Postponement be GRANTED. ORDERED, that the hearing on the denial of Respondent's Motion to Shield Dismissed Protective Order Pursuant to Family Law 4-512 scheduled in the above captioned matter for September 6, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. shall be re-set to another date cleared With the Clerk of the Court and counsel. | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Motion | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Motion for Continuance/Postponement | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ruling
Judge: Curtin, Yolanda L. |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service Ruling Annotated on the Motion to Shorten Time |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ruling Request DENIED to shorten time cc 085/16/2022 S Rani, W R Parry |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion - Postponement/Continuance | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Shorten Time |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of De Novo Appeal Issued | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeal from District Court | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service Notice of Docketing of De Novo Appeal |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of De Novo Appeal Issued cc: Sana Rani, W. Ryan Parry |