Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ESTRADA vs SAGUN
On June 27, 2023 a civil unlimited (motor vehicle - personal inju...) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Noël Wise presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 27, 2023
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Judge
Hon. Noël Wise
Category
Civil Unlimited (Motor Vehicle - Personal Inju...)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Reniel Estrada against Santiago B Sagun. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Sagun, resulting in personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The jurisdiction of the case is i…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/02/2024 at 03:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at HHJ / Department 514 Event |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Noël Wise in Department 514 Hayward Hall of Justice Assignment |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by: Reniel Estrada (Plaintiff) As to: Santiago B Sagun (Defendant) Document |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Reniel Estrada (Plaintiff) As to: Santiago B Sagun (Defendant) Document |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Reniel Estrada (Plaintiff) As to: Santiago B Sagun (Defendant) Document |