Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PRAKASH, et al. vs VASHISHTHA, et al.
On June 21, 2023 a civil unlimited (other real property (not emin...) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Dennis W. Hayashi presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 21, 2023
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil Unlimited (Other Real Property (not emin...)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Overview
Causes of Action
1 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION
25 SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION 26 Breach of Contract
21 On the First Cause of Action:
4 On the Second Cause of Action:
7 On all Causes of Action:
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by the law firm Akay Law on behalf of the plaintiffs, Bhanu Prakash and Mamatha Prakash. The case is being heard in the Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, under unlimited jurisdiction. The plaintiffs are seek…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Dennis Hayashi in Department 518 Hayward Hall of Justice Assignment |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 518 Event |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by: BHANU PRAKASH (Plaintiff); MAMATHA PRAKASH (Plaintiff) As to: VARUNKANT VASHISHTHA (Defendant); MEGHNA TYAGI (Defendant) Document |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: BHANU PRAKASH (Plaintiff); MAMATHA PRAKASH (Plaintiff) As to: VARUNKANT VASHISHTHA (Defendant); MEGHNA TYAGI (Defendant) Document |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: BHANU PRAKASH (Plaintiff); MAMATHA PRAKASH (Plaintiff) As to: VARUNKANT VASHISHTHA (Defendant); MEGHNA TYAGI (Defendant) Document |