Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IN THE MATTER OF: MATULICH
On June 27, 2023 a civil unlimited (petition for change of name) case was filed by Jamie Lynn Zenger, and Peter Matulich, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Michael M. Markman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 27, 2023
Last Refreshed
August 10, 2023
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil Unlimited (Petition for Change of Name)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Name Change
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) Minute Order |
|
August 08, 2023 | Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change | ||
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Decree Changing Name: Result: Granted Result Date: 08/07/2023 Document |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 09:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 08/08/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed by: Peter Matulich (Petitioner); Jamie Lynn Zenger (Petitioner) As to: Peter Matulich (Petitioner); Jamie Lynn Zenger (Petitioner) Service Costs Waived: No Document |
|
August 01, 2023 | Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change | ||
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 09:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at RCD / Department 14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/08/2023 09:30 AM Event |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by: Document |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 09:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 14 Event |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Michael Markman in Department 14 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Peter Matulich (Petitioner) Document |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name Filed by: Peter Matulich (Petitioner) Document |