Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LOMBARDI vs DEFENDANT DOE 1, ARCHDIOCESE, et al.
On June 21, 2023 an unlimited civil (other personal injury/propert...) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 21, 2023
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Unlimited Civil (Other Personal Injury/Propert...)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Overview
Causes of Action
2 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION NEGLIGENCE 3 (Against All Defendants)
13 SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION/FAILURE TO WARN 14 (Against All Defendants)
11 THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION NEGLIGENT HIRING/RETENTION 12 (Against All Defendants)
7 FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION NEGLIGENT FAILURE TO WARN, TRAIN, OR EDUCATE PLAINTIFF 8 (Against All Defendants)
23 FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION SEXUAL BATTERY 24 (Against All Defendants)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
July 21, 2023 | Complex Determination Hearing | ||
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Brad Seligman in Department 23 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complex Determination Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Event |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Event |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Shannon Lombardi (Plaintiff) As to: Defendant Doe 1, Archdiocese (Defendant); Defendant Doe 2, Parish (Defendant) Document |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by: Shannon Lombardi (Plaintiff) As to: Defendant Doe 1, Archdiocese (Defendant); Defendant Doe 2, Parish (Defendant) Document |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Shannon Lombardi (Plaintiff) As to: Defendant Doe 1, Archdiocese (Defendant); Defendant Doe 2, Parish (Defendant) Document |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
The case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex – Case Type Case |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Complex Determination Hearing Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Certificate of Inability to Obtain Declaration Filed by: Shannon Lombardi (Plaintiff) As to: Defendant Doe 1, Archdiocese (Defendant); Defendant Doe 2, Parish (Defendant) Document |