Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LAMELL vs VERNON
On June 13, 2023 a civil unlimited (civil harassment) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Elizabeth A. Grimes presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 13, 2023
Last Refreshed
July 07, 2023
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil Unlimited (Civil Harassment)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Overview
Causes of Action
CLERK THE
By Aral eee COURT
JANUE THOMAS, D
COURT CASE NO:
23CV035754
~-EVYING OFFICER FILE NO:
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at HHJ / Department 519 updated: Result Date to 07/06/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
CH-130 Restraining Order After Hearing (Civil Harassment) Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
July 06, 2023 | Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing | ||
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Keyonna Sariyah Jordon Lamell (Petitioner) As to: Mahogondy Vernon (Respondent) Document |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
CH-200 Proof of Personal Service (Civil Harassment) Filed by: Keyonna Sariyah Jordon Lamell (Petitioner) As to: Mahogondy Vernon (Respondent) Service Type: Personal Document |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth Riles in Department 519 Hayward Hall of Justice Assignment |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CH-160 Request to Keep Minor's Information Confidential Filed by: Keyonna Sariyah Jordon Lamell (Petitioner) As to: Mahogondy Vernon (Respondent) Document |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- CH-165 Order on Request to Keep Minor's Information Confidential: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed Document |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- CH-160 Request to Keep Minor's Information Confidential: Result: Denied Result Date: 06/13/2023 Document |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CH-165 Order on Request to Keep Minor's Information Confidential Filed by: Clerk As to: Mahogondy Vernon (Respondent) Document |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CH-100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order Filed by: Keyonna Sariyah Jordon Lamell (Petitioner) As to: Mahogondy Vernon (Respondent) Document |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Pending in WQ by: Document |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 519 Event |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment): Status Date changed from 06/13/2023 to 06/13/2023 Result: Granted in Part Status changed from Pending in WQ to Issued and Filed Document |