Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IBE vs DEMISSIE
On June 02, 2023 a civil unlimited (civil harassment) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Joscelyn C. Jones presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 02, 2023
Last Refreshed
June 27, 2024
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of Alameda County
Category
Civil Unlimited (Civil Harassment)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2023 | Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105 updated: | ||
June 21, 2023 | Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) | ||
June 21, 2023 | On the Complaint filed by Osinachi Ibe on 06/02/2023, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action | ||
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
On the Complaint filed by Osinachi Ibe on 06/02/2023, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action Dismissal |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105 updated: Result Date to 06/21/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
|
June 21, 2023 | Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing | ||
June 02, 2023 | CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) | ||
June 02, 2023 | Updated -- CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment): | ||
June 02, 2023 | Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105 | ||
June 02, 2023 | Case assigned to Hon. Joscelyn Jones in Department 105 Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse | ||
June 02, 2023 | CH-100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order | ||
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
CH-100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order Filed by: Osinachi Ibe (Petitioner) As to: Rahel Demissie (Respondent) Document |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Pending in WQ by: Document |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment): Status Date changed from 06/02/2023 to 06/02/2023 Result: Denied - Pending Hearing Status changed from Pending in WQ to Issued and Filed Document |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105 Event |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Joscelyn Jones in Department 105 Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse Assignment |