Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
George Kalinowsky vs Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat of Santa Barbara
An Unlimited Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (07) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. Judge Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 28, 2023
Last Refreshed
June 03, 2024
Filing Location
Santa Barbara County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Unlimited Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (07)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Economic Torts
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR:
1. FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE
2. VIOLATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 517200
3. FRAUD
UNLIMITED JURISDICTION
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by George Kalinowsky against Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat of Santa Barbara and Does 1 through 10. The complaint alleges three causes of action: financial elder abuse, violation of the Business and Professions Code 517200, …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: May 28, 2024Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 28, 202424 0528 POS-11944
Date: May 28, 202424 0528 CMC Statement-11944
Date: May 28, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: Mar 04, 2024Minute Order, Filed
Date: Mar 04, 202424 0213 CMC Statement-Kalinowsky
Date: Feb 15, 2024Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: Feb 14, 2024Declaration, Filed
Date: Feb 14, 2024Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: Feb 14, 202424 0214 POS-Kalinowsky
Date: Feb 14, 202424 0209 Declaration of MSG re OSC- Kalinowsky
Date: Feb 14, 202424 0213 CMC Statement-Kalinowsky
Date: Feb 14, 2024Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: Dec 28, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: Dec 18, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: Dec 18, 2023Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: Nov 13, 2023Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: Nov 13, 202323 1113 POS Elec-Kalinowsky
Date: Nov 13, 202323 1110 CMC Statement-Kalinowsky
Date: Nov 13, 2023Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: Oct 24, 2023Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: Oct 24, 202323 1024 Notice of Cont and Hearings-11944
Date: Oct 24, 202323 1024 POS-11944-001
Date: Oct 24, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 23, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: Oct 23, 2023case management
Date: Oct 17, 2023Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: Oct 16, 2023Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: Oct 10, 2023Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: Oct 10, 202323 1010 Case Management Statement-11944-001
Date: Oct 10, 202323 1010 POS-11944-001
Date: Oct 10, 2023Clerks Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: Aug 02, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: Jul 31, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: Jul 31, 2023General Denial, Filed
Date: Jun 26, 2023Kalinwoo
Date: Jun 24, 2023KALINWOSKY
Date: Jun 06, 2023Proof of Service - Summons Complaint, Filed
Date: Apr 26, 202323 0413 SIGNED POS
Date: Apr 26, 2023Proof of Service - Summons Complaint, Filed
Date: Apr 26, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: Mar 29, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: Mar 28, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: Mar 28, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: Mar 28, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: Mar 28, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
24 0528 POS-11944 Proof of Electronic Service, Filed |
|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
24 0528 CMC Statement-11944 Case Management Statement, Filed |
|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | 24 0528 POS-11944 | |
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | 24 0528 CMC Statement-11944 | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Fail to Appear
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Cont'd 6/10/24 |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 24 0213 CMC Statement-Kalinowsky | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
24 0213 CMC Statement-Kalinowsky Case Management Statement, Filed |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
24 0209 Declaration of MSG re OSC- Kalinowsky Declaration, Filed of Michael Regarding OSC re: Failure to Appear |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
24 0214 POS-Kalinowsky Proof of Electronic Service, Filed re: CMC |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | 24 0214 POS-Kalinowsky | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | 24 0209 Declaration of MSG re OSC- Kalinowsky | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | 24 0213 CMC Statement-Kalinowsky | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing, Filed OSC Fail to Appear 3/4/24 |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed OSC Fail to Appear set 3/4/24; cont'd CMC 3/4/24 |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Fail to Appear Defendant's Counsel Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 1110 CMC Statement-Kalinowsky Case Management Statement, Filed |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 1113 POS Elec-Kalinowsky Proof of Electronic Service, Filed re Case Management Statement |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | 23 1113 POS Elec-Kalinowsky | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | 23 1110 CMC Statement-Kalinowsky | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 1024 POS-11944-001 Proof of Electronic Service, Filed |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 1024 Notice of Cont and Hearings-11944 Notice of Continuance, Filed |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | 23 1024 Notice of Cont and Hearings-11944 | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | 23 1024 POS-11944-001 | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed OSC Fail to Appear set for 12/18/23; CMC cont'd to 12/18/23 |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | case management | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 1010 POS-11944-001 Proof of Electronic Service, Filed |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 1010 Case Management Statement-11944-001 Case Management Statement, Filed |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | 23 1010 Case Management Statement-11944-001 | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | 23 1010 POS-11944-001 | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed Minute Order Dated 07/31/2023 |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed No appear; CMC cont'd to 10/23/23 |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Kalinwoo General Denial, Filed |
|
June 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Kalinwoo | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | KALINWOSKY | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 0413 SIGNED POS Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | 23 0413 SIGNED POS | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 0413 SIGNED POS Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (South) Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 0328 SIGNED Civil Case Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 0328 SIGNED Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 0328 Summons Summons Issued, Filed |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
23 0328 SIGNED Complaint Complaint, Filed |