Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Trustmark National Bank v. Pamela Byrd
On February 13, 2023 a civil debt collector case was filed in the jurisdiction of Penobscot County, ME. Judge Mallonee, Bruce C. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 13, 2023
Last Refreshed
December 18, 2023
Filing Location
Penobscot County, ME
Judge
Hon. Mallonee, Bruce C.
Category
Civil Debt Collector
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | other filing - MEMORANDUM OF LAW - filed | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - filed | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | other filing - STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS - filed | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | other filing - AFFIDAVIT - filed | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Granted | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | order - COURT ORDER - entered | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION TO MODIFY/AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER - filed | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | letter - FROM PARTY - filed | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | other filing - WITNESS & EXHIBIT LIST - filed | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | adr - NOTICE OF ADR PROCESS/NEUTRAL - filed | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | order - SCHEDULING ORDER - entered | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | discovery - DISCOVERY DEADLINE - entered | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | assignment - SINGLE JUDGE/JUSTICE - assigned to justice | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | responsive pleading - ANSWER - filed | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | service - CIVIL SUMMONS - filed | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | filing document - COMPLAINT DEBT COLLECTOR - filed |