Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Angela Speed, et al. v. Kevin Harvey, et al.
On October 19, 2021 a civil case was filed in the jurisdiction of Penobscot County, ME. Judge Murray, Ann M. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 19, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 18, 2023
Filing Location
Penobscot County, ME
Judge
Hon. Murray, Ann M.
Category
Civil
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | other filing - STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL - filed | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | order - REPORT OF ADR CONF / RESOLVED - entered | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | adr - REPORT OF ADR CONFERENCE / MEDIATION - filed | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - filed | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | other filing - AFFIDAVIT - filed | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | other filing - STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS - filed | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | adr - NOTICE OF ADR PROCESS/NEUTRAL - filed | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | discovery - DISCOVERY DEADLINE - entered | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Granted | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION TO ENLARGE - filed | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | discovery - DISCOVERY DEADLINE - entered | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | assignment - SINGLE JUDGE/JUSTICE - assigned to justice | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | order - SCHEDULING ORDER - entered | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | responsive pleading - ANSWER - filed | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | service - CIVIL SUMMONS - filed | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | service - CIVIL SUMMONS - filed | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | filing document - COMPLAINT - filed |