Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CARRASCO, NATALIA VS LEYVA, SILVIA JASMIN LOPEZ
On June 16, 2022 a civil harassment prevention (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Carrasco Natalia, against Leyva Silvia Jasmin Lopez, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Peter A. Hernandez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 16, 2022
Last Refreshed
August 05, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Pomona South
Category
Civil Harassment Prevention (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 27, 2023 | hearing |
in Department H, Yang, Bryant Y., Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution Judge: Yang Bryant Y. |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Respondent |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Amended ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 27, 2022 | hearing |
in Department K, Yang, Bryant Y., Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued Judge: Yang Bryant Y. |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 27, 2022 | Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Amended | ||
July 27, 2022 | Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) | ||
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail Filed by Respondent |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response - Civil Harassment (violence) Filed by Respondent |
|
July 15, 2022 | Response - Civil Harassment (violence) | ||
July 15, 2022 | Proof of Service - Mail | ||
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 06, 2022 | hearing |
in Department K, Yang, Bryant Y., Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Yang Bryant Y. |
|
July 06, 2022 | Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) | ||
July 06, 2022 | hearing |
Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766 Restraining Order Hearing Judge: Bryant Y. Yang |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Respondent |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 30, 2022 | Proof of Service | ||
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 29, 2022 | Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115) | ||
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition - Civil Harassment (violence) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 16, 2022 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
June 16, 2022 | Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) | ||
June 16, 2022 | Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) | ||
June 16, 2022 | Petition - Civil Harassment (violence) |