Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROE 190 M.G., AN INDIVIDUAL VS DOE 1, A PUBLIC ENTITY
On December 06, 2022 an intentional conduct - sexual abuse case (in any form) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Yvette M. Palazuelos presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 06, 2022
Last Refreshed
September 18, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Pomona South
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Salvatore Sirna;Category
Intentional Conduct - Sexual Abuse Case (in any form) (General Jurisdiction)
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles (Defendant) |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Plaintiff John Roe 190 M.G.’S Amended Ex Parte Application For In Camera Review: Filed By: John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Orders Granting Plaintiff John Roe 190 M.G.’s Application for in Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action; Order to Seal and Keep Confidential all Certificates of Merit; Signed and Filed by: John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant) |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Plaintiff John Roe 190 M.G.’S Amended Ex Parte Application For In Camera Review: As To Parties changed from DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant) to DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant) | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff John Roe 190 M.G.’S Amended Ex Parte Application For In Camera Review; Filed by: John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant) |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Redacted Attorney Certificate Of Merit Regarding Defendant Doe 1 On Behalf Of Plaintiff John Roe 190 M.G. Filed by: John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff) |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Of Alina Sookasian In Support Of Plaintiff John Roe 190 M.G.’S Amended Ex Parte Application For In Camera Review; Filed by: John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff) |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Redacted Certificate Of Merit By Licensed Mental Health Practitioner For Plaintiff John Roe 190 M.G. Filed by: John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff) |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing: As To Parties: | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Plaintiff John Roe 190 M.G.’s Ex Parte Application for in Camera Review: As To Parties changed from DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant) to DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant) | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Plaintiff John Roe 190 M.G.’s Ex Parte Application for in Camera Review: Filed By: John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff); Result: Denied ; Result Date: |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from ROE 190 M.G., an individual to John Roe 190 M.G., an individual | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Redacted Attorney Certificate of Corroborative Facts; Filed by: John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff John Roe 190 M.G.’s Ex Parte Application for in Camera Review; Filed by: John Roe 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant) |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: LACC) | |
December 27, 2022 | hearing |
Non-Appearance Case Review Re: LACC scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court
Judge: Yvette M. Palazuelos |
|
December 22, 2022 | hearing |
Non-Appearance Case Review Re: LACC scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9
Judge: Yvette M. Palazuelos |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re: Related Cases;) | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 9 - Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action) | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Salvatore Sirna in Department A Pomona Courthouse South | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ROE 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant) |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: ROE 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant) |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ROE 190 M.G., an individual (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a public entity (Defendant) |
|