Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IN THE MATTER OF: HECKMAN, INDIVIDUAL AND ELECTOR IN THE LIVE...
On February 15, 2022 a civil unlimited (petition for writ - mandate) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Frank Roesch presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 15, 2022
Last Refreshed
June 16, 2024
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of Alameda County
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Evelio Grillo;Category
Civil Unlimited (Petition for Writ - Mandate)
Status
Judgment on Appeal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Miscellaneous Clerks Certification Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: Jun 08, 2022Miscellaneous Notice of Certification Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: Jun 08, 2022Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 16, 2022Order re: Initial Case Management Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 06, 2022Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)
Date: May 06, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: Feb 28, 2022Order re: Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: Feb 28, 2022Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: Feb 22, 2022Order re: Court Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: Feb 22, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: Feb 22, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: Feb 22, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2024 | Remittitur affirmed | ||
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remittitur affirmed Filed by: Clerk Disposition Type: Affirmed Document |
|
December 21, 2023 | Updated -- Miscellaneous (Appeal) Judgment affirmed: | ||
December 21, 2023 | Miscellaneous (Appeal) Judgment affirmed | ||
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Miscellaneous (Appeal) Judgment affirmed: Status changed from Issued and Filed to Filed Document |
|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous (Appeal) Judgment affirmed Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 08, 2022 | Miscellaneous Clerk's Certification | ||
June 08, 2022 | Miscellaneous Notice of Certification | ||
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Clerk's Certification Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Notice of Certification Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 25, 2022 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
May 25, 2022 | Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/103 | ||
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Appellant) As to: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Appellant) Document |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/103 Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Appellant) Document |
|
May 16, 2022 | Appeal Packet | ||
May 16, 2022 | Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal | ||
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeal Packet Generated by: Document |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 13, 2022 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
May 13, 2022 | Notice of Appeal Filed | ||
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) Document |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Appellant) As to: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Respondent) With Deposit: Y Document |
|
May 06, 2022 | Order re: Initial Case Management Conference | ||
May 06, 2022 | Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference) | ||
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Initial Case Management Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference) Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
May 06, 2022 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
May 05, 2022 | Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/06/2022 | ||
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/06/2022 Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/06/2022 Event |
|
April 19, 2022 | Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate | ||
March 16, 2022 | Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order | ||
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: Board of Education of the Livermore Valley Joint Unifed School District (Respondent) Document |
|
March 11, 2022 | Opposition NOTICE OF SHEILA FAGLIANOS JOINDER IN OPPOSITIONS OF BOARD OF EDUCATION AND SUSAN JOHNSTON TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | ||
March 11, 2022 | Opposition NOTICE OF ELLEN GOOLDS JOINDER IN OPPOSITIONS OF BOARD OF EDUCATION AND SUSAN JOHNSTON TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | ||
March 11, 2022 | Opposition NOTICE OF DR. DYRELL FOSTERS JOINDER IN OPPOSITIONS OF BOARD OF EDUCATION AND SUSAN JOHNSTON TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | ||
March 11, 2022 | Opposition NOTICE OF SUSAN JOHNSTONS JOINDER IN OPPOSITION OF BOARD OF EDUCATION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; JOHNSTONS OPPOSITION TO PETITION | ||
March 11, 2022 | Opposition NOTICE OF STEPHEN P, GOODMANS JOINDER IN OPPOSITIONS OF BOARD OF EDUCATION AND SUSAN JOHNSTON TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | ||
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition NOTICE OF SHEILA FAGLIANOS JOINDER IN OPPOSITIONS OF BOARD OF EDUCATION AND SUSAN JOHNSTON TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed by: Sheila Fagliano (Respondent) Document |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition NOTICE OF ELLEN GOOLDS JOINDER IN OPPOSITIONS OF BOARD OF EDUCATION AND SUSAN JOHNSTON TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed by: Ellen Goold (Respondent) Document |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition NOTICE OF DR. DYRELL FOSTERS JOINDER IN OPPOSITIONS OF BOARD OF EDUCATION AND SUSAN JOHNSTON TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed by: Dr. Dyrell Foster (Respondent) Document |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition NOTICE OF SUSAN JOHNSTONS JOINDER IN OPPOSITION OF BOARD OF EDUCATION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; JOHNSTONS OPPOSITION TO PETITION Filed by: Susan Johnston (Respondent) Document |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition NOTICE OF STEPHEN P, GOODMANS JOINDER IN OPPOSITIONS OF BOARD OF EDUCATION AND SUSAN JOHNSTON TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed by: Stephen P. Goodman (Respondent) Document |
|
February 28, 2022 | Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 updated: | ||
February 28, 2022 | Order re: Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate | ||
February 28, 2022 | Minute Order (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate) | ||
February 28, 2022 | Amended Petition (Name Extension) VERIFIED FIRST AMENDMENT/ SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | ||
February 28, 2022 | Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandate & Preliminary Injunction | ||
February 28, 2022 | Declaration DECLARATION OF SUSAN KINDER IN SUPPORT OF BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE LIVERMORE VALLEY JOINT UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT’S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | ||
February 28, 2022 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
February 28, 2022 | Declaration DECLARATIONOFKELLYBOWERS, Ed.D.INSUPPORTOFBOARDOF EDUCATIONOFTHELIVERMORE VALLEYJOINTUNIFIEDSCHOOL DISTRICT’SOPPOSITIONTOPETITION FORWRITOFMANDATEAND PRELIMINARYINJUNCTION | ||
February 28, 2022 | Opposition BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE LIVERMORE VALLEY JOINT UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT’S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | ||
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate) Minute Order (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate) Minute Order |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 02/28/2022 Result Type to Held Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 02/28/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandate & Preliminary Injunction Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition (Name Extension) VERIFIED FIRST AMENDMENT/ SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) Document |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECLARATION OF SUSAN KINDER IN SUPPORT OF BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE LIVERMORE VALLEY JOINT UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT’S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed by: Board of Education of the Livermore Valley Joint Unifed School District (Respondent) Document |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Board of Education of the Livermore Valley Joint Unifed School District (Respondent) As to: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner); Tim Dupuis, in his official capacity as ALAMEDA COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); Deborah Cooper, in her official capacity as CONTRA COSTA COUNTY CLERK-RECORDER AND REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent) et al. Document |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE LIVERMORE VALLEY JOINT UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT’S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed by: Board of Education of the Livermore Valley Joint Unifed School District (Respondent) Document |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECLARATIONOFKELLYBOWERS, Ed.D.INSUPPORTOFBOARDOF EDUCATIONOFTHELIVERMORE VALLEYJOINTUNIFIEDSCHOOL DISTRICT’SOPPOSITIONTOPETITION FORWRITOFMANDATEAND PRELIMINARYINJUNCTION Filed by: Board of Education of the Livermore Valley Joint Unifed School District (Respondent) Document |
|
February 28, 2022 | Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate | ||
February 25, 2022 | Request for Judicial Notice | ||
February 25, 2022 | Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order | ||
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) Document |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set a hearing date and briefing schedule scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 03:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 updated: | ||
February 24, 2022 | Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set a hearing date and bri...) | ||
February 24, 2022 | Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set a hearing date and briefing schedule scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 03:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 | ||
February 24, 2022 | Declaration DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA CORNEJO IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME | ||
February 24, 2022 | Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 | ||
February 24, 2022 | Order Setting Expedited Briefing & Hearing Schedule for Writ of Mandate | ||
February 24, 2022 | Opposition OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DEEM PETITION TIMELY FILED | ||
February 24, 2022 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set a hearing date and bri...) Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set a hearing date and bri...) Minute Order |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set a hearing date and briefing schedule scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 03:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 02/24/2022 Result Type to Held Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set a hearing date and briefing schedule scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 03:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 02/24/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA CORNEJO IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME Filed by: Tim Dupuis, in his official capacity as ALAMEDA COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent) Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set a hearing date and briefing schedule scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 03:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 Event |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 Event |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Expedited Briefing & Hearing Schedule for Writ of Mandate Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DEEM PETITION TIMELY FILED Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Ellen Goold (Respondent) Service Date: 02/19/2022 Service Cost Waived: No Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Dr. Dyrell Foster (Respondent) Service Date: 02/19/2022 Service Cost Waived: No Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: L. K. Monroe, in her official capacity as Alameda County Superintendent of Schools (Respondent) Service Date: 02/19/2022 Service Cost Waived: No Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Sheila Fagliano (Respondent) Service Date: 02/19/2022 Service Cost Waived: No Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Susan Johnston (Respondent) Service Date: 02/19/2022 Service Cost Waived: No Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Stephen P. Goodman (Respondent) Service Date: 02/19/2022 Service Cost Waived: No Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Board of Education of the Livermore Valley Joint Unifed School District (Respondent) Service Date: 02/23/2022 Service Cost Waived: No Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Tim Dupuis, in his official capacity as ALAMEDA COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent) Service Date: 02/22/2022 Service Cost Waived: No Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Deborah Cooper, in her official capacity as CONTRA COSTA COUNTY CLERK-RECORDER AND REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent) Service Date: 02/24/2022 Service Cost: 60.00 Service Cost Waived: No Document |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set a hearing date and briefing schedule | ||
February 23, 2022 | Declaration of Contra Costa County Assistant Registrar of Voters Helen Nolan in Response to Petition for Writ of Mandate | ||
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Contra Costa County Assistant Registrar of Voters Helen Nolan in Response to Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed by: Deborah Cooper, in her official capacity as CONTRA COSTA COUNTY CLERK-RECORDER AND REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent) Document |
|
February 22, 2022 | Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 511 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2022 | ||
February 22, 2022 | Order re: Court Order | ||
February 22, 2022 | Minute Order (Court Order) | ||
February 22, 2022 | ** Type of Action changed from Other Writ /Judicial Review to Petition for Writ - Mandate | ||
February 22, 2022 | Updated -- Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION AND EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JASON A. BEZIS; EXHIBITS A AND B: | ||
February 22, 2022 | Request for Judicial Notice | ||
February 22, 2022 | Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION AND EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JASON A. BEZIS; EXHIBITS A AND B | ||
February 22, 2022 | Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 | ||
February 22, 2022 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
February 22, 2022 | Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 17 - Hon. Frank Roesch | ||
February 22, 2022 | Notice of Case Reassignment | ||
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 511 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2022 Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 511 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2022 Event |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Court Order) Minute Order (Court Order) Minute Order |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Court Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
** Type of Action changed from Other Writ /Judicial Review to Petition for Writ - Mandate Case |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION AND EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JASON A. BEZIS; EXHIBITS A AND B: Result: Granted Result Date: 02/24/2022 Updated -- Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION AND EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JASON A. BEZIS; EXHIBITS A AND B: Result: Granted Result Date: 02/24/2022 Document |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) Document |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION AND EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JASON A. BEZIS; EXHIBITS A AND B Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) Document |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 Event |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 17 - Hon. Frank Roesch Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 17 - Hon. Frank RoeschReason: Transfer for Reassignment Assignment |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
February 16, 2022 | Declaration DECLARATION OF ALAN HECKMAN IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 | ||
February 16, 2022 | Request for Judicial Notice | ||
February 16, 2022 | Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) | ||
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECLARATION OF ALAN HECKMAN IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) Document |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) Document |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Case assigned to Hon. Evelio Grillo in Department 1B Rene C. Davidson Courthouse | ||
February 15, 2022 | Updated -- Petition VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: | ||
February 15, 2022 | Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 511 | ||
February 15, 2022 | Summons on PET | ||
February 15, 2022 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
February 15, 2022 | Declaration DECLARATION OF MARCUS CRAWLEY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBIT 7 | ||
February 15, 2022 | Declaration PETITIONER ALAN HECKMANS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBIT 6 | ||
February 15, 2022 | Petition VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | ||
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Petition VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Result: Denied Result Date: 02/28/2022 Updated -- Petition VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Result: Denied Result Date: 02/28/2022 Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Evelio Grillo in Department 1B Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons on PET Issued and Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Tim Dupuis, in his official capacity as ALAMEDA COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); Deborah Cooper, in her official capacity as CONTRA COSTA COUNTY CLERK-RECORDER AND REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); L. K. Monroe, in her official capacity as Alameda County Superintendent of Schools (Respondent) et al. Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration PETITIONER ALAN HECKMANS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBIT 6 Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Tim Dupuis, in his official capacity as ALAMEDA COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); Deborah Cooper, in her official capacity as CONTRA COSTA COUNTY CLERK-RECORDER AND REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); L. K. Monroe, in her official capacity as Alameda County Superintendent of Schools (Respondent) et al. Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Tim Dupuis, in his official capacity as ALAMEDA COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); Deborah Cooper, in her official capacity as CONTRA COSTA COUNTY CLERK-RECORDER AND REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); L. K. Monroe, in her official capacity as Alameda County Superintendent of Schools (Respondent) et al. Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECLARATION OF MARCUS CRAWLEY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBIT 7 Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Tim Dupuis, in his official capacity as ALAMEDA COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); Deborah Cooper, in her official capacity as CONTRA COSTA COUNTY CLERK-RECORDER AND REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); L. K. Monroe, in her official capacity as Alameda County Superintendent of Schools (Respondent) et al. Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed by: Alan Heckman, individual and elector in the Livermore Valley Joint Unified School District (Petitioner) As to: Tim Dupuis, in his official capacity as ALAMEDA COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); Deborah Cooper, in her official capacity as CONTRA COSTA COUNTY CLERK-RECORDER AND REGISTRAR OF VOTERS (Respondent); L. K. Monroe, in her official capacity as Alameda County Superintendent of Schools (Respondent) et al. Document |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 511 Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 511 Event |
|