Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AGUIRRE, GALILEA ABIGAIL - GUARDIANSHIP
On March 04, 2021 a guardianship (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Vega Josue Oswaldo Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Deborah L. Christian presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 04, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 18, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Guardianship (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Status Hearing |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Guardianship Review Hearing - Held Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
May 22, 2023 | hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Guardianship Review Hearing |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Confidential Guardianship Status Report Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 23, 2023 | Minute Order | ||
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - Continued Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 03, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - Continued Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
October 03, 2022 | hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Guardianship Review Hearing |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Minor |
|
September 14, 2022 | Notice - Hearing | ||
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Minor |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) filed on March 4, 2021 by Josue Oswaldo Garcia Vega. ) | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Appointing Guardian (Person only ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Report Court Appointed Counsel ) Filed by Minor |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notification - Cons/Guard Address | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Duties of Guardian Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters (Initial) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2021 | Order - Appointing Guardian - Person only | ||
July 22, 2021 | Duties of Guardian | ||
July 22, 2021 | Letters (Initial) | ||
July 22, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
July 22, 2021 | Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report Court Appointed Counsel | ||
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Report Court Appointed Counsel ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Appointing Guardian (Person only ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Duties of Guardian Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters (Initial) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters (Initial) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Appointing Guardian (Person only ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Report Court Appointed Counsel ) Filed by Minor |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) filed on March 4, 2021 by Josue Oswaldo Garcia Vega. ) | |
July 22, 2021 | hearing | ||
July 22, 2021 | hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Appointment Hearing - Guardian |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Report - DCFS (Search Results ) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Report - DCFS (Search Results ) | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Report - Court Investigator | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters - Temporary Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 29, 2021 | Letters - Temporary | ||
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters - Temporary Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 12, 2021 | PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection | ||
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian | |
March 24, 2021 | Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian | ||
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Counsel | |
March 16, 2021 | PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense - | ||
March 16, 2021 | PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection | ||
March 16, 2021 | Order - Appointing Counsel | ||
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Temp Guardianship - Held Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CAC Appointment Ordered | |
March 12, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Temp Guardianship - Held Appointment Hearing - Temp Guardianship - Held Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
March 12, 2021 | hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Appointment Hearing - Temp Guardianship |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notification - Cons/Guard Address | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Prescribing Notice | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) | ||
March 04, 2021 | Declaration - UCCJEA | ||
March 04, 2021 | Order - Prescribing Notice | ||
March 04, 2021 | Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) | ||
March 04, 2021 | Petition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent) | ||
March 04, 2021 | Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 | ||
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Screening Form Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) |