Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FLORES, DORIANNA VS GALLOSO, DAVID
On February 11, 2021 a custody order-juvenile-final judgment (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Flores Dorianna, against Galloso David, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Elizabeth A. Grimes presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 11, 2021
Last Refreshed
May 02, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Custody Order-Juvenile-Final Judgment (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Custody,Visitation
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
February 01, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Ex Parte Hearing |
|
January 26, 2022 | Declaration - Declaration | ||
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Declaration ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 21, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
January 21, 2022 | hearing |
at 8:30 AM in Department 27, Scully, Elizabeth, Presiding Ex Parte Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Elizabeth |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 20, 2022 | Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) | ||
January 20, 2022 | Ex Parte - Application - re: Temporary Emergency Orders of Child Custody | ||
January 20, 2022 | Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 | ||
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 Filed by Respondent |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Respondent |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) Filed by Respondent |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application (re: Temporary Emergency Orders of Child Custody ) Filed by Respondent |
|
February 11, 2021 | Custody Order - Juvenile Final Judgment | ||
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Custody Order - Juvenile Final Judgment |