Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
OLGA LIDA VERGARA VS ALEXANDER CASTILLO RAMIREZ
On September 07, 2021 a personal injury/property damage/wrongful death - uninsured motorist (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 07, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 05, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2024 | hearing |
Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
July 05, 2023 | hearing |
Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No |
|
June 23, 2023 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Olga Lida Vergara on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Olga Lida Vergara as to the entire action |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff); As to: Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff); As to: Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
June 20, 2023 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 | |
June 20, 2023 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of defendant, Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
June 20, 2023 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of defendant, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Ruling Re Final Status Conference; Filed by: Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Final Status Conference) | |
June 20, 2023 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on | |
June 20, 2023 | hearing |
Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
March 07, 2023 | hearing |
Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
February 21, 2023 | hearing |
Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
February 07, 2023 | hearing |
Pursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10:00 AM
Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
February 07, 2023 | hearing |
Updated -- Event scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial
Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff); As to: Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
February 07, 2023 | hearing |
Pursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
February 07, 2023 | [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO | ||
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff); As to: Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) |
|
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant); As to: Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
January 18, 2022 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees |
|
|
January 18, 2022 | Answer | ||
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) Filed by Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) Filed by Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 13, 2021 | PI General Order |
|
|
October 13, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES | ||
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 07, 2021 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32
Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff); As to: Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff); As to: Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 07, 2021 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32
Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff); As to: Alexander Castillo Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse | |
September 07, 2021 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32
Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
September 07, 2021 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
September 07, 2021 | Complaint | ||
September 07, 2021 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
September 07, 2021 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case |
|
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Olga Lida Vergara (Plaintiff) |
|