Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
OWEN, TANYA VS OWEN, DONALD
On November 16, 2021 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Owen Tanya, against Owen Donald, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 16, 2021
Last Refreshed
March 14, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Long Beach
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2022 | Proposed Order - Ex Parte - Restore Former Name - Proposed Order - Ex Parte - Restore Former Name | ||
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Ex Parte - Restore Former Name (Proposed Order - Ex Parte - Restore Former Name ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 08, 2022 | Notice - Entry of Judgment | ||
July 08, 2022 | Judgment | ||
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 01, 2022 | Request - Enter Default FL165 | ||
July 01, 2022 | Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | ||
July 01, 2022 | Declaration - Default FL170 | ||
July 01, 2022 | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - resp | ||
July 01, 2022 | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure | ||
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (resp ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 19, 2021 | Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons | ||
November 19, 2021 | Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition - Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition | ||
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition (Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 16, 2021 | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | ||
November 16, 2021 | Summons | ||
November 16, 2021 | Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 | ||
November 16, 2021 | Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child | ||
November 16, 2021 | Notice - Case Assignment | ||
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 16, 2021 | hearing |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner |