Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The People of the State of California vs. YUHONG WU Print
On November 10, 2021 an infraction case was filed by The People Of The State Of California, against Wu, Yuhong, represented by Campbell, James Brian, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Sinfield, Lily presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 10, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 18, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Infraction
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Case Outcome Type
Plea
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2022 | hearing | Court Trial Judicial Officer Sinfield, Lily L Hearing Time 1:00 PM Comment 45TH DAY =02/28/2022 | |
February 22, 2022 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Sinfield, Lily L |
||
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Officer not present | |
January 13, 2022 | hearing | Defendant notified to appear for Court Trial | |
January 13, 2022 | hearing | Officer Subpoenaed Comment 1 CITING OFFICER VERIFIED | |
January 13, 2022 | hearing | Bail Waiver Filed / Trial in Absentia | |
January 13, 2022 | hearing | Waiver of Arraignment Request For Court Trial Setting Filed | |
January 13, 2022 | hearing | Attorney for Defendant Waives Arraign./Rights (Comp./Cit.) | |
January 13, 2022 | hearing | Waiver of Arraignment & Court Trial Setting Form printed | |
January 13, 2022 | hearing | Trial in Absentia Form printed | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Officer Subpoenaed 1 CITING OFFICER VERIFIED |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Waiver of Arraignment Request For Court Trial Setting Filed | |
November 30, 2021 | hearing | Appear by Date Extension | |
November 25, 2021 | hearing | Courtesy Notice Printed | |
November 24, 2021 | hearing | Citation Image Loaded |