Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The People of the State of California vs. JUAN RAMOS-URBINA Print
On June 02, 2021 an infraction case was filed by The People Of The State Of California, against Ramos-Urbina, Juan Carlos, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Sinfield, Lily presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 02, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Infraction
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Removed Per AB199 Legislation | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant Notified Mailed minute order dated 04/21/22 |
|
April 21, 2022 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Sinfield, Lily L |
||
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant Notified SENT MIN.ORD. 02/28/2022 |
|
February 28, 2022 | hearing | Requested Arraignment Judicial Officer Sinfield, Lily L Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment MISSED LAST ONE STATES CAR IS IN THE SHOP | |
February 28, 2022 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Sinfield, Lily L |
||
January 14, 2022 | hearing | Defendant Notified Comment SENT MIN.ORD. 01/10/22 | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant Notified SENT MIN.ORD. 01/10/22 |
|
January 11, 2022 | hearing | Advised Defendant of Court Dress Code | |
January 10, 2022 | hearing | Civil Assessment PC1214.1 Added (FTA) | |
January 10, 2022 | hearing | Continued Arraignment Judicial Officer Sinfield, Lily L Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Failed to Appear Comment Defendant ordered to bring proof of: Correction | |
January 10, 2022 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Sinfield, Lily L |
||
December 08, 2021 | hearing | Defendant Advised of Rights | |
December 08, 2021 | hearing | Certified - Registered Interpreter Comment The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. | |
December 08, 2021 | hearing | Requested Arraignment Judicial Officer Sinfield, Lily L Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST DUE DATE EXTENSIN. | |
December 08, 2021 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Sinfield, Lily L |
||
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
|
December 01, 2021 | hearing | Advised Deft Of Court Date/Times | |
December 01, 2021 | hearing | Advised Defendant of Court Dress Code Comment MANDATORY MASK. | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Advised Defendant of Court Dress Code MANDATORY MASK. |
|
September 28, 2021 | hearing | Defendant Notified Of Extension Date | |
September 28, 2021 | hearing | Appear by Date Extension | |
June 09, 2021 | hearing | Courtesy Notice Printed | |
June 09, 2021 | hearing | Citation Image Loaded |