Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JANETT RAMIREZ VS DENY ESCALANTE, ET AL.
On November 05, 2020 a small claims (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Richard F. Walmark presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 05, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Van Nuys East
Category
Small Claims (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401 Compliance Hearing Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
December 30, 2021 | hearing |
Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
December 30, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) of 12/30/2021 | ||
December 30, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) | ||
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Janett Ramirez on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 19, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401 Compliance Hearing Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for 12/30/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
On the Court's own motion, Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for 11/19/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/30/2021 01:30 PM
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
November 19, 2021 | hearing |
Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
November 19, 2021 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01:30 PM
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
November 19, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) | ||
November 19, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) of 11/19/2021 | ||
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) of 11/19/2021; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) | |
September 30, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401 Compliance Hearing Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for 11/19/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
On the Court's own motion, Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for 09/30/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 11/19/2021 01:30 PM
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
September 30, 2021 | hearing |
Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
September 30, 2021 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01:30 PM
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
September 30, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) of 09/30/2021 | ||
September 30, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) | ||
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) of 09/30/2021; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment) | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for 09/30/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
August 05, 2021 | hearing |
Compliance Hearing re: Dismissal/Entry of Judgment scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
July 30, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/30/2021 | ||
July 30, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) | ||
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/30/2021; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 29, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401 Non-Jury Trial Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/29/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 07/29/2021; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
July 29, 2021 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
July 29, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | ||
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/29/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
May 13, 2021 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
May 13, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) | ||
May 13, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 05/13/2021 | ||
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 05/13/2021; Filed by: Clerk |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 05/12/2021; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
May 12, 2021 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
May 12, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | ||
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
February 18, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401 Non-Jury Trial Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
February 18, 2021 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/18/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/12/2021 01:30 PM
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
February 18, 2021 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01:30 PM
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
February 18, 2021 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
February 18, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/18/2021 | ||
February 18, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | ||
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Address for Deny Escalante (Defendant) customer request | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Deny Escalante (Defendant on defendant's claim); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/18/2021; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
February 11, 2021 | Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) | ||
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Deny Escalante (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff on defendant's claim) |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Deny Escalante (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff on defendant's claim) |
|
February 05, 2021 | Notice (name extension) - Notice and acknowledgment of receipt - civil |
|
|
February 05, 2021 | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) | ||
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Deny Escalante (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Siminson (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice and acknowledgment of receipt - civil; Filed by: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Siminson (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice and acknowledgment of receipt - civil; Filed by: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Siminson (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Siminson (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/26/2021 |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Deny Escalante (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/21/2020 |
|
November 06, 2020 | hearing |
Reset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/18/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/18/2021 01:30 PM
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/18/2021 in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
November 06, 2020 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
November 06, 2020 | hearing |
Reset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01:30 PM
Judge: Richard F. Walmark |
|
November 06, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol] | ||
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff) | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff) | |
November 05, 2020 | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court | ||
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Deny Escalante (Defendant); Joseph Siminson (Defendant) |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Janett Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Deny Escalante (Defendant); Joseph Siminson (Defendant) |
|