Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PARKER, MACKENZIE AMIR - GUARDIANSHIP
On January 27, 2020 a guardianship (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Elizabeth A. Grimes presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 27, 2020
Last Refreshed
December 12, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Guardianship (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Status Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Status Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 21, 2023 | hearing |
Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Status Hearing |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel (CAC REPORT ) Filed by Minor |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) Filed by Minor |
|
April 19, 2023 | Report - Court Appointed Counsel - CAC REPORT | ||
April 19, 2023 | Proof of Service - Proof of Service | ||
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Minor |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of Status Hearing ) Filed by Minor |
|
November 17, 2022 | Proof of Service | ||
November 17, 2022 | Notice - Notice of Status Hearing | ||
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of Status Hearing ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Status Hearing - Held - Continued Status Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Court Appointed Counsel Report ) Filed by Minor |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Electronic Service ) Filed by Minor |
|
October 18, 2022 | Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Court Appointed Counsel Report | ||
October 18, 2022 | Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service | ||
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Court Appointed Counsel Report ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Electronic Service ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
September 13, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
September 13, 2022 | hearing |
Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Status Hearing - Held Status Hearing - Held Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order | |
August 30, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
August 30, 2022 | Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order | ||
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Status Hearing - Held - Continued Status Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 29, 2022 | Minute Order - Corrected via Nunc Pro Tunc on 08/29/2022 by D. Begay per Judge Bogdanoff | ||
August 29, 2022 | Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order | ||
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Minor |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel Filed by Minor |
|
August 26, 2022 | Report - Court Appointed Counsel | ||
August 26, 2022 | Proof of Service | ||
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Counsel | |
August 18, 2022 | Order - Appointing Counsel | ||
August 18, 2022 | PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense - | ||
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Court Order Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Court Order Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | CAC Appointment Ordered (F. Edward Navarro ) | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 17, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Status Hearing - Held Status Hearing - Held Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order as Order After Hearing | |
August 16, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
August 16, 2022 | Minute Order as Order After Hearing | ||
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application - Miscellaneous (for Order to Los Angeles County District Attorney to Locate and Return Minor Child ) Filed by Interested Party |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order (Statutory Authority and Purpose for Court Order ) | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order (Protective Custody Warrant ) | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion (for Waiver of Fees (Registration) ) Filed by Interested Party |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum - Points and Authorities Filed by Interested Party |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order (to Los Angeles County District Attorney; to Locate and Return Minor Pursuant to Family Code Sections 3131-3134.5 ) | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application - Miscellaneous (for Protective Custody Warrant ) Filed by Interested Party |
|
July 29, 2022 | Memorandum - Points and Authorities | ||
July 29, 2022 | Order - Protective Custody Warrant | ||
July 29, 2022 | Order - to Los Angeles County District Attorney; to Locate and Return Minor Pursuant to Family Code Sections 3131-3134.5 | ||
July 29, 2022 | Application - Miscellaneous - for Order to Los Angeles County District Attorney to Locate and Return Minor Child | ||
July 29, 2022 | Motion - for Waiver of Fees (Registration) | ||
July 29, 2022 | Application - Miscellaneous - for Protective Custody Warrant | ||
July 29, 2022 | Order - Statutory Authority and Purpose for Court Order | ||
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application - Miscellaneous (for Order to Los Angeles County District Attorney to Locate and Return Minor Child ) Filed by Interested Party Filed by Interested Party |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application - Miscellaneous (for Protective Custody Warrant ) Filed by Interested Party Filed by Interested Party |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum - Points and Authorities Filed by Interested Party Filed by Interested Party |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion (for Waiver of Fees (Registration) ) Filed by Interested Party Filed by Interested Party |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (-Request for Copies ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 17, 2022 | Miscellaneous Document - -Request for Copies | ||
May 17, 2022 | Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 | ||
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (-Request for Copies ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte - Order | |
May 13, 2022 | Ex Parte - Order | ||
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Urgency ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition (for Order Directing District Attorney to Locate Minor and Return to Guardian Pursuant to Family Code 3130 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 10, 2022 | Declaration - of Urgency | ||
May 10, 2022 | Ex Parte - Petition - for Order Directing District Attorney to Locate Minor and Return to Guardian Pursuant to Family Code 3130 | ||
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition (for Order Directing District Attorney to Locate Minor and Return to Guardian Pursuant to Family Code 3130 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Urgency ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Document (-Request for Copies ) | |
April 27, 2022 | Miscellaneous Document - -Request for Copies | ||
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte - Order (DWOP ) | |
April 04, 2022 | Ex Parte - Order - DWOP | ||
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of urgency ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 30, 2022 | Ex Parte - Application | ||
March 30, 2022 | Declaration - of urgency | ||
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of urgency ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notification - Cons/Guard Address (Martha Lewis ) | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters (Initial) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2021 | Letters (Initial) | ||
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters (Initial) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Ruling Filed by Minor |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Minor |
|
October 12, 2021 | Proof of Service | ||
October 12, 2021 | Notice - Ruling | ||
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Ruling Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
October 08, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
October 08, 2021 | hearing |
Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Guardianship Review Hearing |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel Filed by Minor's Counsel |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Minor's Counsel |
|
October 04, 2021 | Report - Court Appointed Counsel | ||
October 04, 2021 | Proof of Service | ||
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel Filed by Minor's Counsel Filed by Minor's Counsel |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Minor's Counsel Filed by Minor's Counsel |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential - Report/Document (Confidential Status Report ) Filed by Minor |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential - Report/Document (Confidential Status Report ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential - Report/Document (Confidential Status Report ) Filed by Minor |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Guardian | |
August 17, 2021 | Order - Appointing Guardian | ||
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) Filed by Minor |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice ) Filed by Minor |
|
August 11, 2021 | Notice - Notice | ||
August 11, 2021 | Proof of Service - Proof of Service | ||
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) Filed by Minor |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice ) Filed by Minor |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Minor |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 10, 2021 | Proof of Service | ||
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29 Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - Continued Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - Continued |
|
August 05, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29 Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - Continued |
|
August 05, 2021 | hearing |
Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Guardianship Review Hearing |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Rejected Proposed Order | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Rejected Proposed Order | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) filed on January 27, 2020 by Martha Johazel Lewis. ) | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Suzuki, Paul T., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held - Motion Granted Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Suzuki Paul T. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Minute Order | ||
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Suzuki, Paul T., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Suzuki Paul T. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) filed on January 27, 2020 by Martha Johazel Lewis. ) | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Report - Court Investigator | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) Filed by Minor |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Report Court Appointed Counsel ) Filed by Minor |
|
July 31, 2020 | Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report Court Appointed Counsel | ||
July 31, 2020 | Proof of Service - Proof of Service | ||
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Report Court Appointed Counsel ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Report Court Appointed Counsel ) Filed by Minor |
|
July 31, 2020 | hearing |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) Filed by Minor |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Court Order Hearing - Held Court Order Hearing - Held Judge: Lippitt Elizabeth A. |
|
June 18, 2020 | Minute Order | ||
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Court Order Hearing - Held Judge: Lippitt Elizabeth A. |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Court Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's own Motion Court Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's own Motion Judge: Lippitt Elizabeth A. |
|
April 01, 2020 | Minute Order | ||
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Court Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's own Motion Judge: Lippitt Elizabeth A. |
|
March 23, 2020 | PR_General Probate - DCFS Search Results | ||
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held Judge: Lippitt Elizabeth A. |
|
February 25, 2020 | Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order | ||
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held Judge: Lippitt Elizabeth A. |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Continuance (Notice of Continuance ) Filed by Minor |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) Filed by Minor |
|
February 20, 2020 | Proof of Service - Proof of Service | ||
February 20, 2020 | Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance | ||
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Continuance (Notice of Continuance ) Filed by Minor Filed by Minor |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Continuance (Notice of Continuance ) Filed by Minor |
|
February 20, 2020 | hearing |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service ) Filed by Minor |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Counsel | |
February 13, 2020 | PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense - | ||
February 13, 2020 | Order - Appointing Counsel | ||
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (of probate investigation appointment ) Filed by Court |
|
February 11, 2020 | Notice - of probate investigation appointment | ||
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (of probate investigation appointment ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (of probate investigation appointment ) Filed by Court |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian (Person Only ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letters - Temporary Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CAC Appointment Ordered | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Temp Guardianship - Held - Motion Granted Appointment Hearing - Temp Guardianship - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Lippitt Elizabeth A. |
|
February 04, 2020 | Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian - Person Only | ||
February 04, 2020 | Minute Order | ||
February 04, 2020 | Notice - Hearing | ||
February 04, 2020 | Letters - Temporary | ||
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letters - Temporary Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian (Person Only ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Temp Guardianship - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Lippitt Elizabeth A. |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian (Person Only ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Temporary - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Elizabeth A. |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Order - Prescribing Notice | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Duties of Guardian Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notification - Cons/Guard Address | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) | |
January 27, 2020 | Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 | ||
January 27, 2020 | Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) | ||
January 27, 2020 | PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT PROBATE DIVISION | ||
January 27, 2020 | Petition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent) | ||
January 27, 2020 | Duties of Guardian | ||
January 27, 2020 | Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) | ||
January 27, 2020 | Order - Prescribing Notice | ||
January 27, 2020 | Declaration - UCCJEA | ||
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Duties of Guardian Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Confidential Screening Form Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) Filed by Petitioner |