Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GOMEZ, LUIS AMADO VS KAMONSIT, PIYATHIDA
On December 01, 2020 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Gomez Luis Amado, against Kamonsit Piyathida, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 01, 2020
Last Refreshed
May 06, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2021 | Judgment | ||
March 19, 2021 | Notice - Entry of Judgment | ||
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 10, 2021 | Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - and final waived | ||
March 10, 2021 | Declaration - Default FL170 | ||
March 10, 2021 | Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | ||
March 10, 2021 | Request - Enter Default FL165 | ||
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (and final waived ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (426-reviewed ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 18, 2020 | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure | ||
December 18, 2020 | Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service | ||
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (Personal Service ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 03, 2020 | Notice - Case Assignment | ||
December 03, 2020 | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | ||
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Assignment | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | |
December 01, 2020 | Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child | ||
December 01, 2020 | Summons | ||
December 01, 2020 | Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 | ||
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |