Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RIDENOUR, KATHY ANN VS RIDENOUR, GARY LEWIS
On December 01, 2020 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Ridenour Kathy Ann, and Ridenour Kathy, against Ridenour Gary Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 01, 2020
Last Refreshed
May 05, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2022 | Notice - Entry of Judgment | ||
February 24, 2022 | Judgment | ||
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 07, 2022 | Declaration - Default FL170 | ||
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 13, 2021 | Request - Enter Default FL165 | ||
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (426-reviewed ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 30, 2021 | Notice - Case Review Re: Default - Noticed by LASC | ||
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC ) | |
August 03, 2021 | Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure | ||
August 03, 2021 | Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition - Personal | ||
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition (Personal ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 26, 2021 | Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property | ||
July 26, 2021 | Declaration - Income and Expense | ||
July 26, 2021 | Declaration - Separate Property | ||
July 26, 2021 | Petition - Amended (1st) - added petitioner's aka name; #8c - determination of support reserved to both parites; #9b - separate property confirmed in FL-160; #10b - community property determined in FL | ||
July 26, 2021 | Summons - Amended - as to petitioner's aka name | ||
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons - Amended (as to petitioner's aka name ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Amended (1st) (added petitioner's aka name; #8c - determination of support reserved to both parites; #9b - separate property confirmed in FL-160; #10b - community property determined in FL-160 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Separate Property Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 27, 2021 | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | ||
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 12, 2021 | Proof of Service of Summons | ||
January 12, 2021 | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure | ||
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 03, 2020 | Notice - Case Assignment | ||
December 03, 2020 | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | ||
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Assignment | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | |
December 01, 2020 | Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child | ||
December 01, 2020 | Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 | ||
December 01, 2020 | Summons | ||
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner |