Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ERWIN DE LEON BARRIOS VS FRANK CLARK, ET AL.
On December 31, 2020 a personal injury/property damage/wrongful death - uninsured motorist (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 31, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 05, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR PROPERTY
DAMAGE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2023 | hearing |
Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
December 02, 2022 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
December 02, 2022 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
December 02, 2022 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
December 01, 2022 | Request for Dismissal | ||
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff); As to: Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios as to the entire action |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 30, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 16, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 16, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to oral stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 16, 2022 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 16, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to oral stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10:00 AM
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 16, 2022 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 16, 2022 | [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO | ||
June 16, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff); As to: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff); Frank Clark (Defendant) |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Final Status Conference) | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 14, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 14, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 01:30 PM
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 01, 2022 | Request for Dismissal | ||
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff); As to: Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios as to Jeannine M. Clark |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Carol R. Rugh (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Stratman, Schwartz & Williams-Abrego to Stratman & Williams-Abrego | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Address for Carol R. Rugh (Attorney) updated | |
February 15, 2022 | Notice of Change of Firm Name | ||
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: Frank Clark (Defendant); New Firm Name: Stratman & Williams-Abrego |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant) Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant) |
|
November 12, 2021 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Frank Clark (Defendant) |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant) Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant) |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant) |
|
February 09, 2021 | Cross-Complaint | ||
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant); As to: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2021 | Answer | ||
February 05, 2021 | Demand for Jury Trial | ||
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant); As to: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
January 29, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE | ||
January 29, 2021 | PI General Order | ||
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 07, 2021 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
January 07, 2021 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff); As to: Frank Clark (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 109.50; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff); As to: Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse | |
December 31, 2020 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
December 31, 2020 | Complaint | ||
December 31, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
December 31, 2020 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff); As to: Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff); As to: Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff); As to: Frank Clark (Defendant); Jeannine M. Clark (Defendant) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Erwin De Leon Barrios (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|