Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RICARDO GARCIA VS LAUREN ZAMORA, ET AL.
On December 31, 2020 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 31, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2023 | hearing |
Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
November 17, 2022 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
November 17, 2022 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
November 17, 2022 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Ricardo Garcia on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Ricardo Garcia as to the entire action |
|
November 16, 2022 | Request for Dismissal | ||
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
June 30, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 16, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 28 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Lauren Zamora (Defendant); As to: Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
April 11, 2022 | [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO | ||
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant) Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant) |
|
April 09, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10:00 AM
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
April 09, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Address for Ari J. Filian (Attorney) null | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ari J. Filian (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Offices of Gregory J. Lucett to LAW OFFICES OF ROBYN S. HOSMER | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant); New Firm Name: LAW OFFICES OF ROBYN S. HOSMER |
|
December 08, 2021 | Notice of Change of Firm Name | ||
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
December 08, 2021 | hearing |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant); As to: Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
March 10, 2021 | Answer | ||
March 10, 2021 | Demand for Jury Trial | ||
March 10, 2021 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Alan Zamora (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 10, 2021 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE | ||
January 29, 2021 | PI General Order | ||
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse | |
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Lauren Zamora (Defendant); Alan Zamora (Defendant) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 31, 2020 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
December 31, 2020 | Complaint | ||
December 31, 2020 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
December 31, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Ricardo Garcia (Plaintiff) |
|