Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
OTOMI HUICHAN VS WHITTIER ASSOCIATES, LLC
On December 01, 2020 an other employment complaint case (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 01, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 05, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Want of Prosecution
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR:
1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES (CAL. LABOR CODE §§201, 1194);
2. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGES (CAL. LABOR CODE §§1182.12, 1194, 1194.2, 1197);
3. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME COMPENSATION (CAL. LABOR CODE §§510, 1194);
4. FAILURE TO PROVIDE ONE DAY OF REST FOR EVERY WORKWEEK (CAL. LABOR CODE §§551 and 552);
5. FAILURE TO PROVIDE MEAL AND REST PERIODS (CAL. LABOR CODE §§226.7, 512);
6. FAILURE TO PROVIDE ITEMIZED WAGE AND HOUR STATEMENTS (CAL. LABOR CODE §§226, ET SEQ.);
7. WAITING TIME PENALTIES (CAL. LABOR CODE §§201-203); AND
8. UNFAIR COMPETITION (BUS. & PROF.
CODE §17200 ET SEQ.);
DEMAND OVER $25,000
-1-
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Appear on 03/25/2022 and Failure to Prosecute the Case) - Held Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
May 11, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED F...) OF 05/11/2022 |
|
|
May 11, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED F...) |
|
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed f...) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 11, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed for Pro Per Plaintiff's Failure to Appear on 02/23/2022) - Held Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed f...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 25, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default Judgment Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
March 25, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
March 25, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed for Pro Per Plaintiff's Failure to Appear on 02/23/2022 Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
March 25, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28 Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed for Pro Per Plaintiff's Failure to Appear on 02/23/2022) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
March 25, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28 Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
March 25, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...) OF 03/25/2022 |
|
|
March 25, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...) |
|
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 25, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
February 23, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
February 23, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default Judgment Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
February 23, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28 Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
February 23, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...) |
|
|
February 23, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...) OF 02/23/2022 |
|
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 23, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...) of 02/23/2022) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 23, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 18, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
January 18, 2022 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default Judgment Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
January 18, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28 Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
January 18, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...) |
|
|
January 18, 2022 | Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
|
January 18, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling (RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 18, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling (RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
December 22, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER |
|
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Entry of Judgment Or Order) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Entry of Judgment Or Order) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default Judgment Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 28 Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
December 16, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...) |
|
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 17, 2021 | Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL AMENDED |
|
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil (AMENDED) Filed by Ramin R. Younessi (Attorney) |
|
November 17, 2021 | hearing |
Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil (AMENDED) Filed by Ramin R. Younessi (Attorney) |
|
November 16, 2021 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
November 16, 2021 | Notice of Ruling | ||
November 16, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) |
|
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
November 16, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 09, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL |
|
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
November 04, 2021 | Notice of Ruling |
|
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2021 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default Judgment Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
November 02, 2021 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
November 02, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 28 Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
November 02, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...) |
|
|
November 02, 2021 | Notice of Ruling |
|
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 02, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
November 02, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 12, 2021 | Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel |
|
|
October 12, 2021 | Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil |
|
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Ramin R. Younessi (Attorney) |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Ramin R. Younessi (Attorney) |
|
September 02, 2021 | Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling (RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling (RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
September 01, 2021 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
September 01, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) |
|
|
September 01, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 23, 2021 | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment |
|
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
August 19, 2021 | Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment |
|
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk |
|
August 16, 2021 | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment |
|
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
July 01, 2021 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
June 29, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) | ||
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 29, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 01, 2021 | hearing |
Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
April 01, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) | ||
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 01, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Rupert A. Byrdsong |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 29, 2021 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
March 17, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
February 18, 2021 | Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
February 18, 2021 | hearing |
Summons (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
January 21, 2021 | Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) | ||
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
January 21, 2021 | hearing |
Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
January 19, 2021 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
December 02, 2020 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Complaint | ||
December 01, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
December 01, 2020 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
December 01, 2020 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Otomi Huichan (Plaintiff) |
|