Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KENNETH H OH VS HELENA YI, ET AL.
On December 01, 2020 a defamation (slander/libel) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 01, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 21, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Defamation (slander/libel) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Slander,Libel,Defamation
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR :
1. Defamation ( Slander
2. Negligence
(Unlimited. Demand over $ 25,000
PARTIES
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
October 27, 2022 | hearing |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
October 25, 2022 | hearing |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
June 27, 2022 | hearing |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
June 27, 2022 | hearing | ||
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
June 17, 2022 | hearing |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
June 17, 2022 | hearing | Final Status Conference | |
May 24, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 20STCV45706 Hearing Date: May 24, 2022 Dept: 74 20STCV45706 KENNETH H OH vs HELENA YI Defendants Unopposed Motion for Terminating Sanctions TENTATIVE RULING : Defendants Second Motion for... | |
May 24, 2022 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Kenneth H Oh on , entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action |
|
May 24, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions) | |
May 24, 2022 | hearing | Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Terminating Sanctions: Filed By: Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: |
|
May 24, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
May 24, 2022 | hearing |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
May 24, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
May 24, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) | ||
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
April 28, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 | |
April 28, 2022 | Motion for Terminating Sanctions | ||
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
April 18, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 20STCV45706 Hearing Date: April 18, 2022 Dept: 74 20STCV45706 KENNETH H OH vs HELENA YI, et al. Defendants Motion for Terminating Sanctions TENTATIVE RULING : The motion is GRANTED IN PAR... | |
April 18, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions) | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Terminating Sanctions: Filed By: Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
April 18, 2022 | hearing |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
April 18, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) | ||
April 18, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
April 18, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 10, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2022 | Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion | ||
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
December 02, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2021 | Motion for Terminating Sanctions | ||
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice OF ORDER DISMISSING ROES 1-50, INCLUSIVE; Filed by: Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
November 08, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER DISMISSING ROES 1-50, INCLUSIVE | ||
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF ORDER DISMISSING ROES 1-50, INCLUSIVE) Filed by Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court |
|
November 03, 2021 | hearing | Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Roes scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Cross-Complaint filed by Julie J Yi, et al. on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to ROES 1-50, inclusive |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Roes) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Roes) - Held Non-Appearance Case Review (re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Roes) - Held Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Roes) | |
November 03, 2021 | hearing |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
November 03, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED ROES) | ||
November 03, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED ROES) OF 11/03/2021 | ||
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Roes)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Roes) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 03, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Roes) - Held Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Dismissal Filed by Court |
|
November 03, 2021 | hearing | Non-Appearance Case Review | |
July 12, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 20STCV45706 Hearing Date: July 12, 2021 Dept: 74 20STCV45706 KENNETH H OH vs HELENA YI Defendants Unopposed Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents and ... | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 12, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses: Filed By: Julie J Yi (Defendant),Helena Yi (Defendant),3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant),Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: ; As To Parties changed from Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) to Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses) | |
July 12, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES) OF 07/12/2021 | ||
July 12, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES) | ||
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 12, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses) of 07/12/2021) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 12, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses | |
July 09, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 20STCV45706 Hearing Date: July 9, 2021 Dept: 74 20STCV45706 KENNETH H OH vs HELENA YI (1) Defendants Unopposed Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and... | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...) | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions: Filed By: 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant),Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant),Helena Yi (Defendant),Julie J Yi (Defendant); Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: |
|
July 09, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions: Name Extension: to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions; As To Parties changed from Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) to Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) | |
July 09, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions: Name Extension: to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions; As To Parties changed from Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) to Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions: Filed By: Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant),Julie J Yi (Defendant),3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant),Helena Yi (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: |
|
July 09, 2021 | Notice of Ruling | ||
July 09, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; HEAR...) | ||
July 09, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
July 09, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 09, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses | |
June 18, 2021 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
June 18, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)) | ||
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 18, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 18, 2021 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) | |
June 11, 2021 | Informal Discovery Conference | ||
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
May 25, 2021 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE; Filed by: Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
May 25, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE | ||
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) Filed by Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) Filed by Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) |
|
May 21, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
May 06, 2021 | Notice of Ruling | ||
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
April 28, 2021 | hearing | Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Roes scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
April 28, 2021 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 | |
April 28, 2021 | hearing | Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 | |
April 28, 2021 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
April 28, 2021 | hearing |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
April 28, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) | ||
April 28, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 02, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
April 02, 2021 | hearing |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
April 02, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
April 01, 2021 | Separate Statement | ||
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2021 | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses | ||
April 01, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE |
|
|
April 01, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE | ||
April 01, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE | ||
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF CLIFFORD A. CLANCEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 19, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
March 19, 2021 | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order | ||
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE; Filed by: Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
March 18, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE | ||
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) Filed by Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) Filed by Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
February 19, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As To All Named Defendants scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...) | |
February 19, 2021 | hearing |
Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
February 19, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...) | ||
February 19, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Michelle Williams Court |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
January 27, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
January 21, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: ROES 1-50, inclusive (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2021 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
January 12, 2021 | Cross-Complaint | ||
January 12, 2021 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
January 12, 2021 | Answer | ||
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service; Filed by: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff); As to: Helena Yi (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service; Filed by: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff); As to: Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service; Filed by: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff); As to: 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Proof of Service: As To Parties changed from 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant), Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) to 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service; Filed by: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff); As to: Julie J Yi (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Amended Proof of Service: Exact Name changed from Proof of Service to Amended Proof of Service; As To Parties changed from 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) to 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Proof of Service: As To Parties changed from Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) to Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) | |
December 29, 2020 | Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
December 29, 2020 | Proof of Personal Service - (AMENDED) | ||
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Proof of Service Filed by Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
December 09, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As To All Named Defendants scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 | |
December 09, 2020 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Helena Yi (Defendant), Julie J Yi (Defendant), Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) to Julie J Yi (Defendant), Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Helena Yi (Defendant), 3699 Wilshire Boulevard LLC, a California corporation (Defendant) | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 09, 2020 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
December 09, 2020 | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service | ||
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Michelle Williams Court in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff); As to: Helena Yi (Defendant); Julie J Yi (Defendant); Jamison Services, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Complaint | ||
December 01, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
December 01, 2020 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
December 01, 2020 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Kenneth H Oh (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk |
|