Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, VS ASTRO PAK CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION
On September 10, 2020 an other breach of contract/warranty (not fraud or negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Barbara Marie Scheper presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 10, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 04, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 30 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (of Settled Case) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (of Settled Case) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
November 18, 2022 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Settled Case scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. as to the entire action |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal of Settled Case; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff); ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal of Settled Case) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 30 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
October 31, 2022 | hearing |
Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 30 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
October 21, 2022 | hearing |
Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
October 18, 2022 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
October 18, 2022 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
October 18, 2022 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Settled Case scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Settlement;) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re Settlement;) | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Settlement;) of ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Settlement;)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Lawrence Jennings Imel (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Lurie Zepeda Schmalz Hogan & Martin to Imel Law Corporation; Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name changed from J. to Jennings | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 30 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
April 08, 2022 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
April 08, 2022 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
April 08, 2022 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
April 08, 2022 | hearing |
Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
April 08, 2022 | hearing |
Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Jury Trial Date scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Final Status Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review Re Statu...) | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Final Status Conference - Held - Continued Final Status Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 30 Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Status of Jury Trial Date) - Held Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Status of 04/18/2022 Jury Trial Date) - Held Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review Re Statu...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review Re Statu...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 08, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Final Status Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
April 08, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Status of 04/18/2022 Jury Trial Date) - Held Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Instructions [list]; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of the Case; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions ([list]) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions ([list]) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List; Filed by: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Instructions; Filed by: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit List; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit List; Filed by: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of the Case; Filed by: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 15, 2022 | hearing |
Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference;) | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 15, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 30 Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
February 18, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
January 19, 2022 | hearing |
Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Jury Trial Date scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 10, 2022 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ? CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS: Filed By: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ? CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS: Status Date changed from to ; Result Date changed from to ; As To Parties changed from ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) to ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ? CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ? CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 12, 2021 | hearing |
Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
May 12, 2021 | hearing |
Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
May 12, 2021 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
May 12, 2021 | hearing |
Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
May 12, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference;) | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 12, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 30 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
May 07, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
May 07, 2021 | hearing |
Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2021 | hearing |
Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 09, 2021 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
March 09, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 09, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
March 09, 2021 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
February 10, 2021 | hearing |
Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
February 09, 2021 | hearing |
Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
February 09, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 09, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 30, Barbara M\. Scheper, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Barbara M. Scheper |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 09, 2021 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 20, 2020 | hearing |
Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer (and Demand for Jury Trial) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer (and Demand for Jury Trial) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
October 16, 2020 | hearing |
Answer (and Demand for Jury Trial) Filed by ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant) |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 15, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30
Judge: Barbara Marie Scheper |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Lawrence J. Imel, Esq. (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Lurie Zepeda et al to Lurie Zepeda Schmalz Hogan & Martin; Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name changed from Jennings to J. | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, to CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Address for Lawrence J. Imel, Esq. (Attorney) updated | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- ASTRO PAK CORPORATION (Defendant): Organization Name changed from ASTRO PAK CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation to ASTRO PAK CORPORATION | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Plaintiff); As to: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Plaintiff); As to: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Barbara M\. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Plaintiff); As to: ASTRO PAK CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2020 | hearing |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. (Plaintiff) |
|