Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JOSEPH VITALE, ET AL. VS JUUL LABS, INC., ET AL.
On August 05, 2020 a product liability (not asbestos or toxic/environmental) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 05, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Product Liability (not asbestos or toxic/environmental) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Mass Torts
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
1. NEGLIGENCE (AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS)
2. STRICT LIABILITY (AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS)
3. FAILURE TO WARN (AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS)
4. NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION (AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS)
5. FRAUDULENT MISREPRESENTATION (AGA)
6. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY (AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS)
7. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY (AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS)
8. DECEIT BY CONCEALMENT —
9. CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUD (AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS)
10. FRAUD (AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS)
11. CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT FRAUD (AGAINST JLI MANAGEMENT AND ALTRIA)
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGESTWELTH CAUSE OF ACTION: AIDING AND ABETTING (AGAINST JLI MANAGEMENT AND ALTRIA)
referenced claims and Causes of Action and as follows:
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. The plaintiffs in this case are Joseph Vitale, Pouyan Nassiri, Susan Spina, Ronald Beckner, Harry Shuman, Roger Wing, Devin Edwards, Daniel Quinn…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | hearing |
Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Further Status Conference |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 12, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02:30 PM | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review /Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal with Prejudice of Non-Communicative Plaintiffs) - Held Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal with Prejudice of Non-Communicative Plaintiffs) - Held |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Non-Appearance Case Review (/Order to Show Cause ReDismissal with Prejudice) - Held Non-Appearance Case Review (/Order to Show Cause ReDismissal with Prejudice) - Held |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Second) With Prejudice Non-Comm...) | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
February 15, 2023 | hearing | Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference) | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Further Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
February 15, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
February 15, 2023 | hearing |
Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Further Status Conference |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing CRC 3.770 Declaration R...) | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling 3.770 Declaration ReLAUSD Complaint) - Held Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling 3.770 Declaration ReLAUSD Complaint) - Held |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling CRC 3.770 Declaration ReMedical Monitoring Class) - Held Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling CRC 3.770 Declaration ReMedical Monitoring Class) - Held |
|
January 17, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING CRC 3.770 DECLARATION R...) | ||
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing CRC 3.770 Declaration R...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference) | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Held Further Status Conference - Held |
|
December 16, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 14, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion - Other JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11 scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 04, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion - Other JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11 scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02:30 PM | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
November 04, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02:30 PM | |
November 04, 2022 | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service | ||
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 03, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation |
|
September 30, 2022 | hearing | Pursuant to written stipulation, Hearing on Motion - Other JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11 scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01:45 PM | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Hearing on Motion - Other (JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Hearing on Motion - Other (ReFifth Amendment/Plaintiff Fact Sheets) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Hearing on Motion - Other (ReFifth Amendment/Plaintiff Fact Sheets) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
September 19, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER RE: FIFTH AMENDMENT/PLAINTIFF FACT ...) | ||
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Re: Fifth Amendment/Plaintiff Fact ...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 14, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion - Other JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11 scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10:30 AM | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Re: Fifth Amendment/Plaintiff Fact ...) | |
September 14, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion - Other JLI's Third Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Discovery Required by Case Management Order No. 11 scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10:30 AM | |
September 14, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion - Other Re: Fifth Amendment/Plaintiff Fact Sheets scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 14, 2022 | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service | ||
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Produc...) | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Hearing on Motion to Compel Production (of Tax Return) - Held Hearing on Motion to Compel Production (of Tax Return) - Held |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Held Further Status Conference - Held |
|
July 25, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUC...) | ||
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Produc...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Payment of Pro Hac Vice Renewal...) | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Status Conference - Held Status Conference - Held |
|
April 13, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) | ||
April 13, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PAYMENT OF PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL...) | ||
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Payment of Pro Hac Vice Renewal...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 13, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Status Conference - Held Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Payment of Pro Hac Vice Renewal...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 13, 2022 | hearing |
Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Status Conference |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Respond to Plaint...) | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Joseph Vitale, et al. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Joseph Vitale as to JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Nicholas Pritzker, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani, Altria Group, Inc., Altria Client Services, LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Enterprises, LLC, and Philip Morris USA, Inc. |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (for Failure to Respond to Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.) - Held Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (for Failure to Respond to Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.) - Held |
|
March 23, 2022 | Request for Dismissal | ||
March 23, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO RESPOND TO PLAINT...) | ||
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Respond to Plaint...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff) Filed by Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Respond to Plaint...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (for Failure to Respond to Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.) - Held Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Joseph Vitale, et al. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Roger Wing as to JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Nicholas Pritzker, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani, Altria Group, Inc., Altria Client Services, LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Enterprises, LLC, and Philip Morris USA, Inc. |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Parker Glasgow (Plaintiff); As to: JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant); James Monsees (Defendant); Adam Bowen (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Ashleigh Carr (Plaintiff); As to: JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant); James Monsees (Defendant); Adam Bowen (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff); As to: Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Joseph Vitale, et al. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Ashleigh Carr as to JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Nicholas Pritzker, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani, Altria Group, Inc., Altria Client Services, LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Enterprises, LLC, and Philip Morris USA, Inc. |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Joseph Vitale, et al. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Pouyan Nassiri as to JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Nicholas Pritzker, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani, Altria Group, Inc., Altria Client Services, LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Enterprises, LLC, and Philip Morris USA, Inc. |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Roger Wing (Plaintiff); As to: JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant); James Monsees (Defendant); Adam Bowen (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Joseph Vitale, et al. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Parker Glasgow as to JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Nicholas Pritzker, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani, Altria Group, Inc., Altria Client Services, LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Enterprises, LLC, and Philip Morris USA, Inc. |
|
March 22, 2022 | Request for Dismissal | ||
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Roger Wing (Plaintiff) Filed by Roger Wing (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Ashleigh Carr (Plaintiff) Filed by Ashleigh Carr (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Parker Glasgow (Plaintiff) Filed by Parker Glasgow (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff) Filed by Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Ashleigh Carr (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Parker Glasgow (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Roger Wing (Plaintiff) |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (for Failure to Respond to Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (for Failure to Respond to Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
March 16, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (for Failure to Respond to Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
March 16, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (for Failure to Respond to Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
March 11, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Respond to Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02:00 PM | |
March 11, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 04, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 04, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) | |
March 03, 2022 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Motion to Quash ...) | |
February 23, 2022 | hearing | Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Clerical Error on | |
February 09, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01:45 PM | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Held Further Status Conference - Held |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Not Held - Clerical Error Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Not Held - Clerical Error |
|
January 26, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY; HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH ...) | ||
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Motion to Quash ...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 26, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Not Held - Clerical Error Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Motion to Quash ...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 26, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Further Status Conference - Held Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Motion to Quash ...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 26, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Not Held - Clerical Error Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
January 26, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Further Status Conference - Held Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
January 25, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
January 25, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
January 25, 2022 | hearing |
Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Further Status Conference |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Further Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
January 20, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
January 20, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
January 18, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01:45 PM | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
October 19, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
October 19, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 11 - Hon. David S\. Cunninghameffective ; Reason: Inventory Transfer | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
August 09, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
August 09, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk |
|
July 29, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01:45 PM | |
July 29, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
June 09, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
June 09, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
June 02, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01:45 PM | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
June 02, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk |
|
March 03, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 26, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference; Further...) | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Held Further Status Conference - Held |
|
February 03, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER...) | ||
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference; Further...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 03, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Further Status Conference - Held Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference; Further...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 03, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Further Status Conference - Held Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference; Further...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 03, 2021 | hearing |
Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Further Status Conference |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
January 29, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
January 29, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 11, Ann I\. Jones, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Ann I. Jones |
|
January 28, 2021 | hearing | Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 28, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) | ||
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
December 10, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham III, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: David S. Cunningham III |
|
December 10, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 11, David S\. Cunningham, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: David S. Cunningham |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 11, Ann I\. Jones, Presiding Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Ann I. Jones |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 04, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01:45 PM | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk |
|
November 03, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of JCCP coordination order and stay of proceedings; Filed by: JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 02, 2020 | Notice - NOTICE OF JCCP COORDINATION ORDER AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS | ||
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of JCCP coordination order and stay of proceedings Filed by JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of JCCP coordination order and stay of proceedings Filed by JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
October 28, 2020 | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service | ||
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference) | |
October 22, 2020 | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service | ||
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk |
|
October 20, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Submission of Stipulation for Coordination and Notice of Stay: As To Parties: removed | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Add-On and Transfer Add-On Cases to Coordinated Proceeding; Signed and Filed by: Non-Party / Other |
|
October 19, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Add-On and Transfer Add-On Cases to Coordinated Proceeding Filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Defendant) [filed under 20STCV29497] Filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Defendant) [filed under 20STCV29497] |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Add-On and Transfer Add-On Cases to Coordinated Proceeding Filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Defendant) [filed under 20STCV29497] |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Submission of Stipulation for Coordination and Notice of Stay; Filed by: |
|
October 16, 2020 | Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF STIPULATION FOR COORDINATION AND NOTICE OF STAY | ||
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Submission of Stipulation for Coordination and Notice of Stay) Filed by JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Submission of Stipulation for Coordination and Notice of Stay) Filed by JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Submission of Stipulation for Coordination and Notice of Stay) Filed by JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 11 - Hon. Ann I\. Jones; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action) | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | The case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Kenneth R. Freeman |
|
August 18, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) | ||
August 18, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 08/18/2020 | ||
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 18, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding Court Order Judge: Kenneth R. Freeman |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 08/18/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff); Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff); Susan Spina (Plaintiff) et al. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff) |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff); As to: JUUL Labs, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned in Department 14 Spring Street Courthouse | |
August 05, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
August 05, 2020 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
August 05, 2020 | Complaint | ||
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff); Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff); Susan Spina (Plaintiff) et al. Filed by Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff); Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff); Susan Spina (Plaintiff) et al. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff); Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff); Susan Spina (Plaintiff) et al. Filed by Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff); Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff); Susan Spina (Plaintiff) et al. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Joseph Vitale (Plaintiff); Pouyan Nassiri (Plaintiff); Susan Spina (Plaintiff) et al. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk |
|