Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HEATHER MOSHER VS OUR PLACE, AN UNKNOWN CALIFORNIA ENTITY, ET AL.
On July 16, 2020 an other employment complaint case (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge David Sotelo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 16, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 04, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2020 | hearing |
Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: David Sotelo |
|
October 08, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: David Sotelo |
|
October 08, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: David Sotelo |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...) | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Heather Mosher on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...) of ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 40 Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held Judge: David Sotelo |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 40 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held Judge: David Sotelo |
|
October 08, 2020 | hearing |
Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service Judge: David Sotelo |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Roy Mendoza (Defendant) |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: Roy Mendoza (Defendant); Result: Granted by Operation of Law; Result Date: |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Roy Mendoza (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Roy Mendoza (Defendant) |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | General Denial; Filed by: Roy Mendoza (Defendant) |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
General Denial Filed by Roy Mendoza (Defendant) Filed by Roy Mendoza (Defendant) |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Roy Mendoza (Defendant) Filed by Roy Mendoza (Defendant) |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Heather Mosher (Plaintiff); As to: Roy Mendoza (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Heather Mosher (Plaintiff); As to: OUR PLACE, an unknown California entity (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 71.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 27, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40
Judge: David Sotelo |
|
July 27, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40
Judge: David Sotelo |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Case Management Conference: As To Parties: removed | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. David Sotelo in Department 40 Stanley Mosk Courthouse | |
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Heather Mosher (Plaintiff); As to: OUR PLACE, an unknown California entity (Defendant); Roy Mendoza (Defendant) |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Heather Mosher (Plaintiff); As to: OUR PLACE, an unknown California entity (Defendant) |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Heather Mosher (Plaintiff); As to: OUR PLACE, an unknown California entity (Defendant) |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Heather Mosher (Plaintiff) |
|