Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
xxxxxxxxxxxxxx VS REDDIT, INC., ET AL.
On March 13, 2020 a defamation (slander/libel) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 13, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Defamation (slander/libel) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Slander,Libel,Defamation
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR:
(1) LIBEL;
(2) FRAUD;
(3) UNFAIR COMPETITION
(CAL. BUS. & PRO. CODE
17200 et seq.);
(4) INTENTIONAL
INTERFERENCE WITH
ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE;
(5) INTENTIONAL INFLICTION
OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS;
(6) NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF
EMOTIONAL DISTRESS
Jury Trial Demand
COMPLAINT
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
October 15, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx as to Craig James Pietrowiak and International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company |
|
October 13, 2021 | Request for Dismissal | ||
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Settlement) | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 28, 2021 | hearing | Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
September 28, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
September 28, 2021 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
September 28, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) | ||
September 28, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/28/2021 | ||
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No |
|
September 27, 2021 | Notice of Settlement | ||
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
May 05, 2021 | Notice of Ruling | ||
May 03, 2021 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of , Final Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.]) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.]) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
May 03, 2021 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [J. Doe]) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [J. Doe]) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
May 03, 2021 | hearing | Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
May 03, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) | ||
May 03, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/03/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION | ||
May 03, 2021 | hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference |
|
April 29, 2021 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.] scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF NONPARTY REDDIT, INC.S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA; Filed by: Non-party, Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Non-Party); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 29, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NONPARTY REDDIT, INC.S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA | ||
April 29, 2021 | hearing |
Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF NONPARTY REDDIT, INC.S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA) Filed by Non-party, Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Non-Party) |
|
April 22, 2021 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena [J. Doe] scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice BY NON-PARTY J. DOE WITHDRAWING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO REDDIT, INC. Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 22, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE BY NON-PARTY J. DOE WITHDRAWING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO REDDIT, INC. | ||
April 22, 2021 | hearing |
Notice (BY NON-PARTY J. DOE WITHDRAWING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO REDDIT, INC.) Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [J. Doe]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [J. Doe]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [J. Doe]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF xxxxxxxxxxxxxx IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition PLAINTIFF xxxxxxxxxxxxxx?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF JASON K. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT OF; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF xxxxxxxxxxxxxx IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY J. DOE’S MOTION TO QUASH | ||
April 15, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JASON K. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT OF | ||
April 15, 2021 | Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF xxxxxxxxxxxxxx’S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO J. DOE’S MOTION TO QUASH | ||
April 15, 2021 | Separate Statement | ||
April 15, 2021 | hearing |
Separate Statement Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2021 | hearing |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF JASON K. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT OF) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2021 | hearing |
Opposition (PLAINTIFF xxxxxxxxxxxxxx?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2021 | hearing |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF xxxxxxxxxxxxxx IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (plaintiff's subpoena to Reddit, Inc.) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion to Quash (plaintiff's subpoena to Reddit, Inc.) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (plaintiff's subpoena to Reddit, Inc.) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO NON-PARTY J. DOE?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA; Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party); As to: Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
April 01, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO NON-PARTY J. DOE’S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA | ||
April 01, 2021 | Separate Statement | ||
April 01, 2021 | hearing |
Separate Statement Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
April 01, 2021 | hearing |
Notice (OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO NON-PARTY J. DOE?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA) Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [J. Doe]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [J. Doe]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [J. Doe]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
March 29, 2021 | hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference |
|
March 29, 2021 | hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
March 15, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 11:00 AM | |
March 15, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.] scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 11:00 AM | |
March 15, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena [J. Doe] scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 11:00 AM | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of , Stipulation for Modified Briefing; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for modified briefing schedule on J. Doe's Motion to Quash; Signed and Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
March 15, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/15/2021, STIPULATION FOR MODIFIED BRIEFING | ||
March 15, 2021 | hearing |
Stipulation and Order (for modified briefing schedule on J. Doe's Motion to Quash) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
March 15, 2021 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 15, 2021 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/15/2021, Stipulation for Modified Briefing) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 08, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena [Reddit, Inc.] scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:30 AM | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 08, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena [J. Doe] scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:30 AM | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
March 08, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:30 AM | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
March 08, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/08/2021 | ||
March 08, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
March 08, 2021 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/08/2021) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 08, 2021 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
March 03, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Quash plaintiff's subpoena to Reddit, Inc. scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10:30 AM | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Quash Subpoena; Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
March 03, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Quash subpoena [J. Doe] scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
March 03, 2021 | hearing |
Motion to Quash (Subpoena) Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration OF NAOMI GILENS IN SUPPORT OF J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA; Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration OF J. DOE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA; Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
March 01, 2021 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
March 01, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF J. DOE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA | ||
March 01, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF NAOMI GILENS IN SUPPORT OF J. DOE’S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA | ||
March 01, 2021 | hearing |
Declaration (OF NAOMI GILENS IN SUPPORT OF J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA) Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
March 01, 2021 | hearing |
Separate Statement Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
March 01, 2021 | hearing |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
March 01, 2021 | hearing |
Declaration (OF J. DOE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA) Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON NON-PARTY J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF?S SUBPOENA TO REDDIT, INC. [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON NON-PARTY J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF?S SUBPO; Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Stipulation for Briefing Schedule) of , Order re Stipulation: Status Date changed from to ; As To Parties: removed | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Stipulation for Briefing Schedule) of , Order re Stipulation; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order re Stipulation for Briefing Schedule) | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order RE: STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON NON-PARTY J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF?S SUBPOENA TO REDDIT, INC. Signed and Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
February 22, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE) OF 02/22/2021, ORDER RE STIPULATION | ||
February 22, 2021 | Order - ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON NON-PARTY J. DOE’S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF’S SUBPOENA TO REDDIT, INC. | ||
February 22, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE) | ||
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
February 22, 2021 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order re Stipulation for Briefing Schedule)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 22, 2021 | hearing |
Order (RE: STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON NON-PARTY J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF?S SUBPOENA TO REDDIT, INC.) Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
February 22, 2021 | hearing |
Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON NON-PARTY J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF?S SUBPOENA TO REDDIT, INC.; [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON NON-PARTY J. DOE?S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF?S SUBPO) Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
February 22, 2021 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Stipulation for Briefing Schedule) of 02/22/2021, Order re Stipulation) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel xxxxxxxxxxxxxx's Further Responses to Special Interrogatoreis, Set One; Signed and Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
January 27, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses [Special Interrogatories] scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses: Filed By: International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant),Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Response of xxxxxx Neibic...) of , Order Granting Motion to Compel; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Response of xxxxxx Neibic...) | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses ([Special Interrogatories]) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses ([Special Interrogatories]) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
January 27, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE OF xxxxxx NEIBIC...) OF 01/27/2021, ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL | ||
January 27, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE OF xxxxxx NEIBIC...) | ||
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
January 27, 2021 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Response of xxxxxx Neibic...) of 01/27/2021, Order Granting Motion to Compel) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 27, 2021 | hearing |
Order (Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel xxxxxxxxxxxxxx's Further Responses to Special Interrogatoreis, Set One) Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses ([Special Interrogatories]) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
January 27, 2021 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Response of xxxxxx Neibic...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 27, 2021 | hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses |
|
January 27, 2021 | hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena |
|
January 27, 2021 | hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference |
|
January 25, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10:30 AM | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order re Stipulation and Protective Order for Confident...) | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Protective Order; Signed and Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff); Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
January 25, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10:30 AM | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Stipulation and Protective Order for Confident...) of , Stipulation and Protective Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
January 25, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
January 25, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR CONFIDENT...) | ||
January 25, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR CONFIDENT...) OF 01/25/2021, STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER | ||
January 25, 2021 | hearing |
Stipulation and Order (for Protective Order) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
January 25, 2021 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Stipulation and Protective Order for Confident...) of 01/25/2021, Stipulation and Protective Order) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
January 25, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Statement Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
January 25, 2021 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order re Stipulation and Protective Order for Confident...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 09, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses [Special Interrogatories] scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10:45 AM | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
December 09, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10:45 AM | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order FOR CONTINUANCE OF DECEMBER 9, 2020 HEARING; Signed and Filed by: Non-party, Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Non-Party); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 09, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10:45 AM | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses ([Special Interrogatories]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses ([Special Interrogatories]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 09, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/09/2020 | ||
December 09, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
December 09, 2020 | Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF DECEMBER 9, 2020 HEARING | ||
December 09, 2020 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 09, 2020 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/09/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses ([Special Interrogatories]) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 09, 2020 | hearing |
Stipulation and Order (FOR CONTINUANCE OF DECEMBER 9, 2020 HEARING) Filed by Non-party, Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Non-Party) |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance; Filed by: J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 08, 2020 | Notice of Appearance | ||
December 08, 2020 | hearing |
Notice of Appearance Filed by J. Doe (Non-Party) |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply REPLY OF INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS? ASSOCIATION, LLC IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; Filed by: International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
December 02, 2020 | Reply - REPLY REPLY OF INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS’ ASSOCIATION, LLC IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE | ||
December 02, 2020 | hearing |
Reply (REPLY OF INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS? ASSOCIATION, LLC IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) Filed by International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration OF JASON K. FELDMAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS? ASSOCIATION, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL SOE ci TO : : INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
November 25, 2020 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON K. FELDMAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS’ ASSOCIATION, LLC’S MOTION TO COMPEL SOE CI TO : : INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE | ||
November 25, 2020 | hearing |
Declaration (OF JASON K. FELDMAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS? ASSOCIATION, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL SOE ci TO : : INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Separate Statement PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS? ASSOCIATION, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition PLAINTIFF?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS? ASSOCIATION, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
November 24, 2020 | Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT PLAINTIFF’S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS’ ASSOCIATION, LLC’S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF’S SPEC | ||
November 24, 2020 | Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF’S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS’ ASSOCIATION, LLC’S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF’S SP | ||
November 24, 2020 | hearing |
Separate Statement (PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS? ASSOCIATION, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
November 24, 2020 | hearing |
Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS? ASSOCIATION, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
November 12, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11:00 AM | |
November 09, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
November 06, 2020 | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses | ||
November 06, 2020 | Separate Statement | ||
November 06, 2020 | hearing |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
November 06, 2020 | hearing |
Separate Statement Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 29, 2020 | Notice of Ruling | ||
October 29, 2020 | hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 28, 2020 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11:00 AM | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Strike Punitive Damages: Filed By: International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant),Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Strike Punitive Damages: Exact Name: Motion to Strike Punitive Damages; As To Parties: removed | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Strike Puni...) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Quash Subpoena: Name Extension: Subpoena; As To Parties: removed | |
October 28, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11:00 AM | |
October 28, 2020 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 28, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Strike Punitive Damages scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Julie Park, # 13925; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Strike Puni...) | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Held - Continued Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Held - Continued Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Strike (Punitive Damages) - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Motion to Strike (Punitive Damages) - Held - Motion Denied Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
October 28, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE PUNI...) | ||
October 28, 2020 | Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER JULIE PARK, # 13925 | ||
October 28, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE PUNI...) OF 10/28/2020 | ||
October 28, 2020 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Strike Puni...) of 10/28/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Strike (Punitive Damages) - Held - Motion Denied Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Held - Continued Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
October 28, 2020 | hearing |
Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (Julie Park, # 13925) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
October 28, 2020 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Strike Puni...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 28, 2020 | hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to Strike Punitive Damages |
|
October 28, 2020 | hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference |
|
October 28, 2020 | hearing |
Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
October 22, 2020 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
October 22, 2020 | hearing |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE; Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA; Filed by: Non-party, Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Non-Party) |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
October 21, 2020 | Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA | ||
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
October 21, 2020 | hearing |
Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA) Filed by Non-party, Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Non-Party) |
|
October 21, 2020 | hearing |
Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE) Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Punitive Damages; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 15, 2020 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES | ||
October 15, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Statement Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 15, 2020 | hearing |
Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Strike Punitive Damages) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
October 13, 2020 | Demand for Jury Trial | ||
October 13, 2020 | Case Management Statement | ||
October 13, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Statement Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
October 13, 2020 | hearing |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Jason K. Feldman in support of plaintiff's opposition to non-party Reddit's motion to quash; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of xxxxxxxxxxxxxx in support of plaintiff's opposition to non-party Reddit's motion to quash; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition to Non-Party Reddit's Motion to Quash; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 09, 2020 | Separate Statement | ||
October 09, 2020 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY REDDIT'S MOTION TO QUASH | ||
October 09, 2020 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON K. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY REDDIT'S MOTION TO QUASH | ||
October 09, 2020 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF xxxxxxxxxxxxxx IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY REDDIT'S MOTION TO QUASH | ||
October 09, 2020 | hearing |
Declaration (of xxxxxxxxxxxxxx in support of plaintiff's opposition to non-party Reddit's motion to quash) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 09, 2020 | hearing |
Declaration (of Jason K. Feldman in support of plaintiff's opposition to non-party Reddit's motion to quash) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 09, 2020 | hearing |
Opposition (to Non-Party Reddit's Motion to Quash) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 09, 2020 | hearing |
Separate Statement Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 07, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10:30 AM | |
October 07, 2020 | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order | ||
October 07, 2020 | hearing |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
September 16, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Quash; Filed by: Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration OF NATASHA AMLANI IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY REDDIT, INC.?S MOTION TO QUASH; Filed by: Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 14, 2020 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF NATASHA AMLANI IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY REDDIT, INC.’S MOTION TO QUASH | ||
September 14, 2020 | Separate Statement | ||
September 14, 2020 | Motion to Quash | ||
September 14, 2020 | hearing |
Motion to Quash (Subpoena) Filed by Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 14, 2020 | hearing |
Declaration (OF NATASHA AMLANI IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY REDDIT, INC.?S MOTION TO QUASH) Filed by Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 14, 2020 | hearing |
Separate Statement Filed by Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash Filed by Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE OF xxxxxxxxxxxxxx TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE OFF CALENDAR; Filed by: International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
August 24, 2020 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
August 24, 2020 | Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE OF xxxxxxxxxxxxxx TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE OFF CALENDAR | ||
August 24, 2020 | hearing |
Notice (OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE OF xxxxxxxxxxxxxx TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE OFF CALENDAR) Filed by International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
August 21, 2020 | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses | ||
August 21, 2020 | Separate Statement | ||
August 21, 2020 | hearing |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
August 21, 2020 | hearing |
Separate Statement Filed by International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Strike (Punitive Damages) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Strike (Punitive Damages) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Strike (Punitive Damages) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
July 10, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Strike Punitive Damages scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
July 10, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Strike Punitive Damages scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10:30 AM | |
July 10, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10:30 AM | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
July 10, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
July 10, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/10/2020 | ||
July 10, 2020 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/10/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
July 10, 2020 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
June 19, 2020 | Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES | ||
June 19, 2020 | hearing |
Notice of Motion (TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES) Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Setting Motion to Strike Punitive Damages) | |
June 16, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10:00 AM | |
June 16, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Strike Punitive Damages scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Setting Motion to Strike Punitive Damages) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
June 16, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES) | ||
June 16, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES) OF 06/16/2020 | ||
June 16, 2020 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Setting Motion to Strike Punitive Damages)) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding Court Order Judge: Michael L. Stern |
|
June 16, 2020 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Motion to Strike Punitive Damages) of 06/16/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 12, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx as to Reddit, Inc., a California corporation and Victoria De Capua |
|
May 11, 2020 | Request for Dismissal | ||
May 11, 2020 | hearing |
Request for Dismissal Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx as to ScreenWritingCommunity.Net., a corporation of unknown origin and William Donovan |
|
May 08, 2020 | Request for Dismissal | ||
May 08, 2020 | hearing |
Request for Dismissal Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer OF DEFENDANTS INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS? ASSOCIATION, LLC, AND CRAIG JAMES PIETROWIACK TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); As to: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
May 07, 2020 | Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS’ ASSOCIATION, LLC, AND CRAIG JAMES PIETROWIACK TO COMPLAINT | ||
May 07, 2020 | Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) | ||
May 07, 2020 | hearing |
Answer (OF DEFENDANTS INTERNATIONAL SCREENWRITERS? ASSOCIATION, LLC, AND CRAIG JAMES PIETROWIACK TO COMPLAINT) Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
May 07, 2020 | hearing |
Motion to Strike Punitive Damages Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Craig James Pietrowiak (Defendant); International Screenwriters' Association, LLC., a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2020 | hearing | Due to Clerical Error, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Address for Jason K. Feldman (Attorney) updated | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Jason K. Feldman (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Office of Jason K Feldman to Law Office of Jason K Feldman, PC | |
March 17, 2020 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
March 17, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 17, 2020 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
March 17, 2020 | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service | ||
March 17, 2020 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
March 17, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
March 17, 2020 | hearing |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 17, 2020 | hearing |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
March 17, 2020 | hearing |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 17, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff); As to: Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); William Donovan (Defendant); ScreenWritingCommunity.Net., a corporation of unknown origin (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff); As to: Reddit, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); William Donovan (Defendant); ScreenWritingCommunity.Net., a corporation of unknown origin (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 13, 2020 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
March 13, 2020 | Complaint | ||
March 13, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
March 13, 2020 | hearing |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 13, 2020 | hearing |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
March 13, 2020 | hearing |
Complaint Filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxx (Plaintiff) |
|