Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CASTILLO, DAISY VS ACEVEDO, ERICK ANTONIO
On September 18, 2020 a dv prevention w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Castillo Daisy, against Acevedo Erick Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Susan L. Lopez-Giss presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 18, 2020
Last Refreshed
May 08, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Judge
Hon. Susan L. Lopez-Giss
Category
DV Prevention w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | hearing |
Department F at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Restraining Order Hearing Judge: Susan L. Lopez-Giss |
|
October 25, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
October 23, 2020 | hearing |
Department F at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Restraining Order Hearing Judge: Susan L. Lopez-Giss |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department F Restraining Order Hearing Judge: Susan L. Lopez-Giss |
|
October 23, 2020 | Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) | ||
October 23, 2020 | Minute Order | ||
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 23, 2020 | hearing |
at 8:30 AM in Department F, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued Judge: Susan |
|
September 24, 2020 | Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) | ||
September 24, 2020 | Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) | ||
September 24, 2020 | Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation) | ||
September 24, 2020 | Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 | ||
September 24, 2020 | Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - All Granted | ||
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (All Granted ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2020 | hearing |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 18, 2020 | Proof of Service - By Personal Service - TRO | ||
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (By Personal Service - TRO ) Filed by Petitioner |