Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ANGELA MELAMED, ET AL. VS FARMERS GROUP INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, ET AL.
On August 21, 2020 an insurance coverage (not complex) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 21, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 18, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Santa Monica
Category
Insurance Coverage (not complex) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT
FOR COMPENSATORY and
PUNITIVE DAMAGES
1. Breach of Insurance Contract
2. Breach of Covenant of Good Faith & Fair Dealing
3. Fraud
4. Elder Abuse
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Jury Trial ((7 Days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial ((7 Days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Jury Trial ((7 Days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Jury Trial ((7 Days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
June 13, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Jury Trial Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
June 03, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Final Status Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
May 04, 2022 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff); As to: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff); Farmers Group Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Angela Melamed, et al. on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Angela Melamed and Akhtar Melamed as to the entire action |
|
May 04, 2022 | Request for Dismissal | ||
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
April 27, 2022 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 27, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 27, 2022 | hearing |
Jury Trial (7 Days) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk |
|
April 27, 2022 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 27, 2022 | hearing |
Trial Readiness Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 27, 2022 | Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) | ||
April 27, 2022 | Notice of Settlement | ||
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
March 25, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to oral stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to oral stipulation, Jury Trial (7 Days) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment By: Mid-Century Insurance Company scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment By: Mid-Century Insura...) | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P, Elaine W. Mandel, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (ByMid-Century Insurance Company) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (ByMid-Century Insurance Company) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Continued Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Continued Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference - Held - Continued Trial Readiness Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Trial Readiness Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY: MID-CENTURY INSURA...) | ||
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment By: Mid-Century Insura...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Jury Trial (7 Days) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Summary Adjudication: Filed By: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Case Management Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 23, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement (of Disputed and Undisputed Facts) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement (of Disputed and Undisputed Facts) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Separate Statement of Disputed and Undisputed Facts; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2022 | Reply - REPLY BRIEF OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS | ||
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
REPLY BRIEF OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
REPLY BRIEF OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 14, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Jury Trial Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 14, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2022 | Separate Statement | ||
March 08, 2022 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO M S A MARCH 23 | ||
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to M S A March 23) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to M S A March 23) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition to M S A March 23; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 04, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Final Status Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
March 04, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 10, 2022 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 10, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 10, 2022 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Trial Readiness Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Trial Readiness ...) | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P, Elaine W. Mandel, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Continued Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Continued Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference - Held - Continued Trial Readiness Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 09, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 09, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 09, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 09, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 09, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Continued Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 09, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 09, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS; TRIAL READINESS ...) | ||
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Trial Readiness ...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Trial Readiness ...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Opposition to Motions for Terminating sanctions) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Opposition to Motions for Terminating sanctions) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition Opposition to Motions for Terminating sanctions; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 13, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 13, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 13, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Court Order Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 13, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 13, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 13, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) OF 01/13/2022 | ||
January 13, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) | ||
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Motion for Terminating Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Motion for Terminating Sanctions) of ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Motion for Terminating Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Motion for Terminating Sanctions) of 01/13/2022) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re: Motion for Terminating Sanctions) | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Motion for Terminating Sanctions) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P, Elaine W. Mandel, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 12, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P, Elaine W. Mandel, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing: Filed By: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
January 12, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 12, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 12, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 12, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING) | ||
January 12, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing) | |
January 12, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Trial Readiness Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
January 12, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 11, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 11, 2022 | Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS | ||
January 11, 2022 | Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING | ||
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition (OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition (OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); As to: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department P Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (ByMid-Century Insurance Company) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (ByMid-Century Insurance Company) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 07, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 07, 2022 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 07, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
January 07, 2022 | hearing |
in Department P Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (ByMid-Century Insurance Company) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 10, 2021 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Trial Readiness Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
December 10, 2021 | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order | ||
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
December 08, 2021 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
December 07, 2021 | Motion for Terminating Sanctions | ||
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Memorandum of Points & Authorities IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS: As To Parties: removed | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF FORREST HUNT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF DONALD RENKENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANDREW HODSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS | ||
November 19, 2021 | Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS | ||
November 19, 2021 | Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS | ||
November 19, 2021 | Motion for Summary Adjudication | ||
November 19, 2021 | Brief - BRIEF INDEX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS |
|
|
November 19, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KATY A. NELSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS | ||
November 19, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FORREST HUNT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS | ||
November 19, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DONALD RENKENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS | ||
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF FORREST HUNT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF KATY A. NELSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Brief (INDEX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF ANDREW HODSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement (OF MATERIAL UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF DONALD RENKENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF KATY A. NELSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Brief (INDEX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF ANDREW HODSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF DONALD RENKENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement (OF MATERIAL UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF FORREST HUNT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement OF MATERIAL UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF KATY A. NELSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF ANDREW HODSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Brief INDEX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 05, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 20SMCV01130 Hearing Date: November 5, 2021 Dept: P Tentative Ruling Melamed, et al. v. Farmers Insurance Group, Inc., Case No. 20SMCV01130 Hearing Date November 5, 2021 Defendants Motion ... | |
November 05, 2021 | hearing |
Jury Trial scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery re: failure to respond;...) | |
November 05, 2021 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment By: Mid-Century Insurance Company scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 05, 2021 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Jury Trial scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 09:00 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 05, 2021 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09:00 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P, Elaine W. Mandel, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Discovery refailure to respond; request for production; for Interrogatories (After IDC no response)) - Held Hearing on Motion to Compel (Discovery refailure to respond; request for production; for Interrogatories (After IDC no response)) - Held Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 05, 2021 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 05, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery re: failure to respond; request for production; for Interrogatories (After IDC no response) Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 05, 2021 | hearing |
in Department P Hearing on Motion to Compel (Discovery refailure to respond; request for production; for Interrogatories (After IDC no response)) - Held Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 05, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RE: FAILURE TO RESPOND;...) | ||
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery re: failure to respond;...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery re: failure to respond;...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 05, 2021 | hearing |
Pursuant to oral stipulation, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment By: Mid-Century Insurance Company scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 05, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 05, 2021 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery re: failure to respond; request for production; for Interrogatories (After IDC no response) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 02, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Jury Trial Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
November 02, 2021 | hearing |
in Department P Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,759; DECLARATION OF KATY A. NELSON; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2021 | Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,759; DECLARATION OF KATY A. NELSON | ||
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,759; DECLARATION OF KATY A. NELSON) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2021 | hearing |
Reply (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,759; DECLARATION OF KATY A. NELSON) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
October 22, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Final Status Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
October 22, 2021 | hearing |
in Department P Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
October 22, 2021 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery re: failure to respond; request for production; for Interrogatories (After IDC no response) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (Reponses to Written Discovery) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (Reponses to Written Discovery) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Reponses to Written Discovery; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P Informal Status Conference ((Telephonic rediscovery Issues)) - Held - Advanced and Heard Informal Status Conference ((Telephonic rediscovery Issues)) - Held - Advanced and Heard |
|
September 17, 2021 | hearing |
in Department P Informal Status Conference ((Telephonic rediscovery Issues)) - Held - Advanced and Heard |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P, Elaine W. Mandel, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Informal Status Conference (Telephonic Re: Discovery Issues)) | |
September 15, 2021 | hearing |
in Department P Court Order Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference (Telephonic Re: Discovery Issues))) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference (Telephonic Re: Discovery Issues))) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 15, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Informal Status Conference (Telephonic re: discovery Issues) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Held - Advanced and Heard on | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (ByMid-Century Insurance Company) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (ByMid-Century Insurance Company) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
September 08, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
September 08, 2021 | hearing |
in Department P Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
September 08, 2021 | hearing |
in Department P Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (ByMid-Century Insurance Company) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY ISSUES) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY ISSUES) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice NOTICE OF INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY ISSUES; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
September 08, 2021 | hearing | Informal Status Conference (Telephonic re: discovery Issues) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P | |
September 01, 2021 | hearing |
Trial Readiness Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES: Filed By: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
July 27, 2021 | hearing |
Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONT...) | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P, Elaine W. Mandel, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES) - Held Hearing on Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES) - Held Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | hearing |
Trial Readiness Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | hearing |
in Department P Hearing on Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES) - Held Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONT...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONT...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 27, 2021 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment By: Mid-Century Insurance Company scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 09:00 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | hearing |
Jury Trial scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment By: Mid-Century Insurance Company scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Jury Trial scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 09:00 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES: Filed By: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
July 22, 2021 | hearing |
Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
April 22, 2021 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P, Elaine W. Mandel, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 22, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 22, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) | ||
April 22, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Case Management Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
April 22, 2021 | hearing |
Trial Readiness Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 22, 2021 | hearing |
Jury Trial scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Angela Melamed, et al. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Angela Melamed and Akhtar Melamed as to Farmers Insurance Group Inc. |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Angela Melamed, et al. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Angela Melamed and Akhtar Melamed as to Farmers Insurance Exchange |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Angela Melamed, et al. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Angela Melamed and Akhtar Melamed as to Fire Insurance Exchange |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Angela Melamed, et al. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Angela Melamed and Akhtar Melamed as to Farmers Group Inc., a Nevada Corporation |
|
March 22, 2021 | Request for Dismissal | ||
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
March 17, 2021 | Answer | ||
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P, Elaine W. Mandel, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 17, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) | ||
February 17, 2021 | hearing |
Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Case Management Conference Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department P Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 17, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
February 17, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
February 08, 2021 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
February 08, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff); As to: Farmers Group Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); Farmers Insurance Group Inc. (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint (1st); Issued and Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff); As to: Farmers Group Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); Farmers Insurance Group Inc. (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST) | ||
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint (1st)) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint (1st)) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Name Extension: (1st) | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff); As to: Farmers Group Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); Farmers Insurance Group Inc (Defendant) et al. |
|
September 28, 2020 | Substitution of Attorney | ||
September 28, 2020 | Amended Complaint | ||
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
September 28, 2020 | hearing |
Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Farmers Group Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant), Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) to Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant), Farmers Group Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant) | |
August 24, 2020 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff); As to: Farmers Group Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2020 | Complaint | ||
August 21, 2020 | Notice of Rejection - Pleadings | ||
August 21, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
August 21, 2020 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
August 21, 2020 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Angela Melamed (Plaintiff); Akhtar Melamed (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P
Judge: Elaine W. Mandel |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|