Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS ENGLAND, DARRION DAVONTE
On November 17, 2020 a dept. of child support services (dcss) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by County Of Los Angeles, against England Darrion Davonte, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 17, 2020
Last Refreshed
May 12, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dept. of Child Support Services (DCSS) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2022 | Notice - Entry of Judgment | ||
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 23, 2022 | Proof of Service of Summons | ||
May 23, 2022 | DSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620 | ||
May 23, 2022 | DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630 | ||
May 23, 2022 | DSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697 | ||
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
DSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
DSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
DSU - Judgment Packet Received - FC17430 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 17, 2020 | DSU - Summons and Complaint | ||
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | DSU - Summons and Complaint PROCEEDINGS HELD |