Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Mohamed Hersi vs. Does 1 to 20
A 24 Unlimited - Product Liability case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 28, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 20, 2023
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
24 Unlimited - Product Liability
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Mohamed Hersi against Does 1 to 20. The complaint alleges negligence and products liability as the causes of action. The incident occurred on August 1, 2018, in Fresno, California, where Hersi sus…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: Jun 15, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: Jun 14, 2022Stipulation Filed
Date: Jun 07, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: Jun 07, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: Jan 29, 2021ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: Jan 15, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: Jan 14, 2021Answer Filed
Date: Jan 04, 2021Proof of Service
Date: Dec 16, 2020Proof of Service
Date: Dec 10, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: Dec 01, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: Nov 19, 2020Amendment filed
Date: Jul 29, 2020Summons issued and filed
Date: Jul 29, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 29, 2020Civil Complaint filed
Date: Jul 28, 2020Civil case cover sheet
Date: Jul 28, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial by both est. 5-7 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Katie Trinh Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
6-15-2022 Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed Trial continued to: 8-28-2023 Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
6/14/2022-Proposed to Continue Trial and related dated Order Received for Signature Forwarded to: 502 Order to Continue Trial and related dated |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
06/07/22 Exp App Stip to Req to Cont Trial Stipulation Filed Ex Parte Application by Stipulation to Request to Continue Trial and Related Dates |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
06/07/22 Proposed Order Order Received for Signature ***Order not signed, party to submit new orde 6-9-2022*** Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for: Proposed Order Re Ex Parte Application by Stipulation to Request to Continue Trial and Related Dates |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Requested by Party | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation ADR Stipulation Mediation filed Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Lee Jacobson |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee Answer Filed |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint DEFECTIVE Reason : Date listed in 5.a. is incomplete. |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Amendment filed Naming Doe 1 |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Notice of Hearing of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Pruposes |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Civil Complaint filed |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil case cover sheet |