Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IN THE MATTER OF: JILL YU
On November 08, 2019 a petition for change of name (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Yu Jill, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Edward B. Moreton, Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 08, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
civil
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Name Change
Status
Other
Case Duration
2 months and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2020 | Decree Changing Name | ||
January 14, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) | ||
January 14, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 44, Edward B\. Moreton, Jr., Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Edward B. Moreton Jr. |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name; Filed by: Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 44, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 14, 2020 | Tentative Ruling | No appearance is necessary. The petition will be GRANTED. Petitioner can obtain a copy of the signed decree one week from 01/14/2020 at the certification window in Room 112.
Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
December 04, 2019 | Proof of Publication | ||
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication; Filed by: Jill Yu (Petitioner); Service Costs Waived: No |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) | ||
November 08, 2019 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
November 08, 2019 | Petition for Change of Name | ||
November 08, 2019 | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) | ||
November 08, 2019 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44 | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Edward B\. Moreton in Department 44 Stanley Mosk Courthouse | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Jill Yu (Petitioner) |
|