Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The People of the State of California vs. ANTONIO SCOTT Print
On April 19, 2019 an infraction case was filed by The People Of The State Of California, against Scott, Antonio Oneal, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Sinfield, Lily presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 19, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Infraction
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Closed to Revenue Recovery | |
August 30, 2021 | hearing | Requested Arraignment Judicial Officer Sinfield, Lily L Hearing Time 10:00 AM | |
August 30, 2021 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Sinfield, Lily L |
||
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Update to Revenue Recovery | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Referred to Traffic School (via Court) court orders no payments on this case |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Citation | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant Advised of Rights via electronic recording |
|
August 23, 2021 | hearing | Advised Defendant of Court Dress Code Comment AND FACE COVERING | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Advised Defendant of Court Dress Code AND FACE COVERING |
|
September 27, 2019 | hearing | Case Assigned to Collections | |
September 27, 2019 | hearing | Failure To Appear Notice 3 | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Assigned to Revenue Recovery | |
September 26, 2019 | hearing | Failure To Appear Eligible Case 3 | |
August 24, 2019 | hearing | Failure To Appear Notice 2 | |
August 24, 2019 | hearing | Failure To Appear DMV Hold | |
August 24, 2019 | hearing | PC1214.1 Failure to Appear Civil Assessment | |
August 24, 2019 | Docket Event | PC1214.1 Failure to Appear | |
August 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure To Appear - Added | |
August 23, 2019 | hearing | Failure To Appear Eligible Case 2 | |
July 22, 2019 | hearing | Failure To Appear Notice 1 | |
July 21, 2019 | hearing | Failure To Appear Eligible Case 1 | |
May 20, 2019 | hearing | Citation Image Loaded | |
May 10, 2019 | hearing | Courtesy Notice Printed | |
May 10, 2019 | hearing | Citation Image Loaded |