Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Vadim Miesegaes vs Unknown Superior Court Clerk of San Luis Obispo
An Unlimited Civil Rights (08) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. Judge Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 23, 2019
Last Refreshed
June 03, 2024
Filing Location
Santa Barbara County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Timothy J Staffel;Category
Unlimited Civil Rights (08)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 3 months and 16 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Hospital at Atascadero ("DSH—A"). Defendant Powell and hi g Dep Jty Clerks
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed
Date: Apr 28, 2020Case Management Order, Filed
Date: Feb 28, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: Feb 19, 2020Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: Feb 19, 2020Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: Jan 23, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 23, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: Jan 23, 2020Demurrer
Date: Jan 23, 2020Clerks Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: Jan 23, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: Jan 22, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 22, 2020Case Management Order, Filed
Date: Jan 22, 2020Reply, Filed
Date: Jan 16, 2020Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: Jan 15, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: Jan 14, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 14, 2020Recusal, Filed
Date: Jan 14, 2020Case Management Order, Filed
Date: Jan 14, 2020Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed
Date: Jan 14, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: Jan 06, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: Dec 23, 2019Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: Dec 23, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: Dec 20, 2019Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed
Date: Nov 18, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: Oct 30, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: Oct 30, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: Oct 10, 2019Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer, Filed
Date: Sep 30, 2019Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: Sep 30, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: Sep 13, 2019Declaration of Demurring Party CCP 430.41(a), Filed
Date: Aug 28, 2019Proof of Service - Summons Complaint, Filed
Date: Aug 09, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: Jul 16, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: Jul 01, 2019Notice, Filed
Date: Jun 27, 2019Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: Jun 20, 2019Statement, Filed
Date: Jun 17, 2019Request for Entry of Default, Filed
Date: Jun 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: Feb 26, 2019Application, Filed
Date: Feb 26, 2019Summons Issued, Filed
Date: Feb 26, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver, Granted/Filed
Date: Feb 26, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order, Filed CMC continued to 06/10/2022 |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration, Filed of Vadim Stanley Miesegaes |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint, Filed No Summons Filed |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint, Filed | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling, Filed First Amended Complaint to be filed by 2/28/20 |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order/Ruling Case Management Conference Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer, Filed Demurrer Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed Sent both parties a copy of the Minute Order dated 1/23/2020 |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling, Filed | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order, Filed CMC continued to 01/23/2020 |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply, Filed to Oppostion to Demurrer to Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply, Filed | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continued CMC/Hearing Notice of Continuance, Filed |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Disqual/Recusal Minute Order Recusal, Filed as to Judge Timothy J Staffel |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed /Rescheduled Hearing |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Recusal, Filed | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continued CMC/Hearing Notice of Continuance, Filed on Demurrer |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance, Filed | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Telephonic Appearance |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Personal Non-Appearance of the Plaintiff |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Opposition and Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer and Request for Judicial Notice |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Reciprocal Assignment |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer, Filed to Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support; Declaration of Kevin M McCormick re Meet and Confer |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice, Filed | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer, Filed | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of the Nonappearance of the Plaiantiff and to Related this Notice to cases 19CVp0072 and 19CVP0262 |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Demurring Party CCP 430.41(a), Filed | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Submission |
|
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Continued Case Management & Ruling |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Waiver of Appearance |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing, Filed | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement, Filed of Disputed Fact and Re-Request of Entry of Default |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement, Filed | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default, Filed NOT ENTERED - No Proof of Service on file |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default, Filed NOT ENTERED - No Proof of Service |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default, Filed | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application, Filed for Leave to file Denial of Rights Claim |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, Granted/Filed | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees, Filed | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Application, Filed | |
February 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed in Original Jurisdiction | |
February 23, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |