Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
A-L Financial Corp Vs Mancinas
On June 12, 1998 a small claims $0 - $1500 case was filed by A-L Financial Corp, against Mancinas Rocio, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 12, 1998
Last Refreshed
November 09, 2021
Filing Location
Santa Clara County, CA
Filing Court House
Santa Clara
Category
Small Claims $0 - $1500
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Purged | |
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Issued) Text = Los Angeles Co-$5382.63 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec |
|
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = interest $327.93 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Notice of Renewal of Judgment Legacy Name = SC Misc Document |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = served by mail, Notice of Renewal of Judgment; Application for and Renewal of Judgment Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Assignment Text = Pacific Credit Exchange Legacy Name = SC Assignment of Judgment |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Application: Renewal Judgment Text = total renewed judgment $5,039.70 Legacy Name = SC Renewal of Judgment |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = costs $0.00, credit $0.00, interest $2,459.70 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment |
|
July 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = Document -- Writ of Execution Returned Unsatisfied; County of Santa Clara. Operator: LG Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Legacy Name = Writ of Exec - Returned Unsatisfied Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2001 |
|
April 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Issued) Text = Document -- Writ of Execution -- Santa Clara County. Description: $3290.81 Operator: RDL Fee Amount: $7.00 Document Issued Legacy Name = Writ of Execution Decision = M Closed = 04/18/2001 |
|
April 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = Document -- Memo of Cost/Accrued Interest/Credit. Operator: RDL Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Interest, Cost And Credit: Interest: $723.81 Cost: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Legacy Name = Memo of Costs after Judgment Decision = M Closed = 04/18/2001 |
|
February 09, 1999 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Check To Arthur Mancinas At Counter Operator: GCA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 02/09/1999 |
|
February 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Letter From Deft-Attch-To Gretchen Operator: LDC Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Received Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 02/08/1999 |
|
February 08, 1999 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Ck Ret'D By Post Office Operator: GCA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Received Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 02/08/1999 |
|
January 27, 1999 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Ck#14535 $500.00 Bail Exon:A Mancinas Operator: MAH Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 01/27/1999 |
|
January 25, 1999 | hearing |
Hearing: Order of Examination
Judge: Department 96 |
|
January 25, 1999 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: 01/25/1999, Time: 08:30, Dept: 96, Operator: CAK Bail Amount: $500.00, Bail Status Code/Name: CCBA/Cash Bail Exonerated Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 01/25/1999 |
|
January 25, 1999 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- Clerk's Minutes. Operator: CAK Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By : Commissioner James Heath Proceedings Minutes Are Recorded As Follows: Party(Ies) Sworn Case Purged By Court Bail Exonerated Bail Amount Set: $0.00 -- No Further Notice Waived Description -- No Further Stipulation Description Comment: No Oex For 120 Days Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 01/25/1999 |
|
January 25, 1999 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Bench Warrant Hrg As To Rocio Mancinas Bail Amount: $500.00 Bail Status Code/Name: Ccba/Cash Bail Exonerated Decision = M Closed = 01/25/1999 |
|
December 16, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Warrant Issued 11/16/98 Returned/Filed Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 12/16/1998 |
|
December 16, 1998 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing -- Date: 01/25/1999, Time: 08:30 SC15 Order of Exam-Converted Legacy Document 3B. Dept: 96 Operator: CAK Fee Amount: $0.00, Bail Amount: $500.00, Bail Status Code/Name: CCBA/Cash Bail Exonerated Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 12/16/1998 |
|
December 16, 1998 | Docket Event |
Warrant: Issued Text = Document -- Notice to Appear on Bench Warrant. Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Party Name: Rocio Mancinas Date And Time: Date: 01/25/1999, Time: 08:30AM Comment: Cbo, Arthur Mancinas, $500.00 Legacy Name = Bench Warrant Decision = M Closed = 12/16/1998 |
|
November 30, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Copies (6) Operator: CAK Fee Amount: $6.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 11/30/1998 |
|
November 16, 1998 | Docket Event |
Warrant: Issued Text = Document -- Bench Warrant Issued. Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Issued Bail Amount: $500.00 Information Entry: Rocio Mancinas Comment: $100.00 Check #679 Sent To The Sheriff'S Office. Legacy Name = Bench Warrant Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/16/1998 |
|
November 10, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Warrant/File To Comm For Signature Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 11/10/1998 |
|
November 09, 1998 | hearing |
Hearing: Order of Examination
Judge: Department 96 |
|
November 09, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Order Of Exam As To Rocio Mancinas Decision = M Closed = 11/09/1998 |
|
November 09, 1998 | Docket Event |
Warrant: Issued Text = Document -- Bench Warrant Ordered. Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Time Issued: 08:30AM Party Name: Rocio Mancinas Bail Amount: $500.00 Comment: Cash Bail Self/Cash Bail W/Authorization To Apply. Legacy Name = Bench Warrant Decision = M Closed = 11/09/1998 |
|
November 09, 1998 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: 11/09/1998, Time: 08:30, Dept: 05, Operator: VA Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 11/09/1998 |
|
November 09, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- Clerk's Minutes. Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By : Commissioner Harold L Cole Proceedings Minutes Are Recorded As Follows: Warrant Issued Bail Amount Set: $500.00 -- No Further Notice Waived Description -- No Further Stipulation Description Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 11/09/1998 |
|
November 02, 1998 | Docket Event |
Application: Order of Examination Text = Document -- Order of Examination. Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Service Filed: Rocio Mancinas Service Filed: By Personal Service Service Filed: $25.00 Fee For Service Date And Time: Date: 11/09/1998, Time: 08:30AMService Filed Date And Time: Date: 11/09/1998, Time: 08:30AM Legacy Name = Application & Order for Appearance, Exam Decision = M Closed = 11/02/1998 |
|
November 02, 1998 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing -- Date: 11/09/1998, Time: 08:30 SC15 Order of Exam-Converted Legacy Document 3B. Dept: 05 Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00, Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 11/02/1998 |
|
September 14, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: File To Comm For Signature Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 09/14/1998 |
|
September 14, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Oex Set For 11/09/98 Operator: VA Fee Amount: $14.00 Document Issued Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 09/14/1998 |
|
September 14, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Oex Signed And Mailed Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 09/14/1998 |
|
July 17, 1998 | hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 96 |
|
July 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Repo Default Balance Decision = M Closed = 07/17/1998 |
|
July 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- Appearance Minutes. Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By: Pro Tem Brad Chibos Party Name: Rommel Vargas For A-L Financial Corp Party Name: (Not Present) Proceedings: Date: No Date, Time: No Time -- Minutes Are Recorded As Follows: Court Stipulation To Plaintiff Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 07/17/1998 |
|
July 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = Document -- Judgment Contested -- Small Claims. Operator: VA Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By: Pro Tem Brad Chibos -- Venue Confirmed -- Or Flag Indicated Principal And Costs: Principal: $2,500.00 Costs: $60.00 Total Costs: $2,560.00 Comment: Party Name: Rocio Mancinas Principal And Costs: Principal Amount: $0.00 Costs: $0.00 Total Costs: $0.00 Comment: None Party Name: Payment: Date: No Date, Payment Amount: $0.00 Other: Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Given To The Pltf In -- Mailed Date: No Date Other: Court. Nsf Check & Contract Cancelled By Judgment. -- Mailed Date: 07/17/1998 Comment: Exhibits Returned To The Plaintiff In Court. Legacy Name = Judgment Decision = M Closed = 07/17/1998 |
|
July 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: 07/17/1998, Time: 08:30, Dept: 06, Operator: VA Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 07/17/1998 |
|
June 24, 1998 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = Document -- Proof of Service On. Description: Mancinas R-Sub Serv Operator: CAK Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service-Small Claims Decision = M Closed = 06/24/1998 |
|
June 15, 1998 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing -- Date: 07/17/1998, Time: 08:30 SC01 Small Claims-Converted Legacy Document 3B. Dept: 06 Operator: Fee Amount: $0.00, Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 06/15/1998 |
|
June 12, 1998 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- SCMN Money-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Not Specified, Operator: MBA Fee Amount: $35.00, Complaint Amount: $2,500.00 Case Does Not Involve a Military Party Complaint Summons Not Issued Number of Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected by Judgment: 0 Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 06/12/1998 |
|
June 12, 1998 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |