Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MEASURES, OLGA VS MEASURES, JONATHAN PAUL
On July 24, 2018 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Measures Olga, against Measures Jonathan Paul, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
2 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final waived ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final waived ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (426-reviewed ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Assignment | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Petitioner |