Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BARSAMYAN, VARDUI ROSE VS. SIMONYAN, MARTUN
On July 24, 2018 a legal separation w/ minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Barsamyan Vardui Rose, against Simonyan Martun, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Mark H. Epstein presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 08, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Legal Separation w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
3 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 84, Kazadi, Michelle L., Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Off Calendar - No Appearance Restraining Order Hearing - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Kazadi Michelle L. |
|
October 12, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 81, Wilcox, Wendy L., Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made Judge: Wilcox Wendy L. |
|
October 07, 2022 | Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) | ||
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) | |
October 06, 2022 | Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case) - DV w/ Minor Child Within Existing Case | ||
October 06, 2022 | Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) | ||
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case) (DV w/ Minor Child Within Existing Case ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2020 | Stipulation and Order - Re: Modication Of Child Custody And Visitation (Post Judgment) | ||
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (Re: Modication Of Child Custody And Visitation (Post Judgment) ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (Re: Modication Of Child Custody And Visitation (Post Judgment) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 27, 2018 | Ex Parte - Application | ||
November 27, 2018 | Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) | ||
November 27, 2018 | Minute Order | ||
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 81, Epstein, Mark H, Presiding Ex Parte Hearing - Held - Order Made Ex Parte Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Epstein Mark H |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 81, Epstein, Mark H, Presiding Ex Parte Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Mark H |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2018 | Declaration - Default FL170 | ||
October 26, 2018 | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure | ||
October 26, 2018 | Notice - Entry of Judgment | ||
October 26, 2018 | Judgment | ||
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (SENT TO DEPT 81 ORDERS Received in Dept. 81 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (SENT TO DEPT 81 ORDERS Received in Dept. 81 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 05, 2018 | Declaration - UCCJEA - on 1st amended petition | ||
October 05, 2018 | Petition - Amended (1st) - petition changed to legal separation; #3a - completed date of separation; #9b - confirm separate prop as listed; #10b - determine community prop as listed | ||
October 05, 2018 | Summons - on 1st amended petition | ||
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons (on 1st amended petition ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (on 1st amended petition ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition - Amended (1st) (petition changed to legal separation; #3a - completed date of separation; #9b - confirm separate prop as listed; #10b - determine community prop as listed ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (on 1st amended petition ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons (on 1st amended petition ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition - Amended (1st) (petition changed to legal separation; #3a - completed date of separation; #9b - confirm separate prop as listed; #10b - determine community prop as listed ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 17, 2018 | Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition | ||
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 06, 2018 | Request - Enter Default FL165 | ||
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 29, 2018 | Proof of Service | ||
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2018 | Proof of Service | ||
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 15, 2018 | Certificate of Completion | ||
August 15, 2018 | Minute Order | ||
August 15, 2018 | Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) - EXPIRES 08-15-2023 | ||
August 15, 2018 | FCS-Mediation Memo | ||
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 81, Epstein, Mark H, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both Judge: Epstein Mark H |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (EXPIRES 08-15-2023 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 81, Epstein, Mark H, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both Judge: Mark H |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (EXPIRES 08-15-2023 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 01, 2018 | Proof of Service of Summons | ||
August 01, 2018 | Proof of Service | ||
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case) | ||
July 24, 2018 | Declaration - Income and Expense | ||
July 24, 2018 | Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property | ||
July 24, 2018 | Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) | ||
July 24, 2018 | Order - Attend Mediation | ||
July 24, 2018 | Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) | ||
July 24, 2018 | Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 | ||
July 24, 2018 | Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child | ||
July 24, 2018 | Declaration - UCCJEA | ||
July 24, 2018 | Summons | ||
July 24, 2018 | Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 | ||
July 24, 2018 | Notice - Other Cases Involving Minor Children (UCF 001) | ||
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order - Attend Mediation | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Other Cases Involving Minor Children (UCF 001) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Assignment | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Other Cases Involving Minor Children (UCF 001) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner |