Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
xxxxxx, xxxxxxxxx VS xxxxxx, xxxxx xxxxxxxxx
On July 24, 2018 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Xxxxxx Xxxxxxxxx, against Xxxxxxxxxxxx Xxxxxxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
8 months and 23 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Respondent |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Respondent |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (426 REVIEW ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation Filed by Respondent |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Assignment | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner |