Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK VS ANDREW R BENNETT
On July 24, 2018 a collections case - seller plaintiff (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 20, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Chatsworth
Category
Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment: Name Extension: blank; As To Parties changed from ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) to ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Default judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff DISCOVER BANK against Defendant ANDREW R BENNETT on the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on for the principal amount of $13,236.07 and costs of $573.00 for a total of $13,809.07. |
|
May 15, 2019 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Proposed; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) |
|
May 15, 2019 | Judgment - Judgment Proposed | ||
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Default judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff DISCOVER BANK against Defendant ANDREW R BENNETT on the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 07/24/2018 for the principal amount of $13,236.07 and costs of $573.00 for a total of $13,809.07. |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment: Name Extension: blank; As To Parties changed from ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) to ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Proposed; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/15/2019 | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Brief Summary of the Case Pursuant to CRC, Rule 3.1800(a) and Reimbursement for Costs (C.C.P. 1033); Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Default entered as to ANDREW R BENNETT; On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by DISCOVER BANK, does 1-10, inclusive only |
|
May 13, 2019 | Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal | ||
May 13, 2019 | Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Brief Summary of the Case Pursuant to CRC, Rule 3.1800(a) and Reimbursement for Costs (C.C.P. 1033) | ||
May 13, 2019 | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment | ||
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Default entered as to ANDREW R BENNETT; On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 07/24/2018 |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on 07/24/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by DISCOVER BANK, does 1-10, inclusive only |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Brief Summary of the Case Pursuant to CRC, Rule 3.1800(a) and Reimbursement for Costs (C.C.P. 1033); Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
November 28, 2018 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/20/2018; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) |
|
October 15, 2018 | Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence | ||
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Diligence; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2018 | Declaration (name extension) - Re Diligence | ||
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Diligence; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
July 26, 2018 | hearing | Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740) | |
July 24, 2018 | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case | ||
July 24, 2018 | Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) | ||
July 24, 2018 | Complaint | ||
July 24, 2018 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740) | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANDREW R BENNETT (Defendant) |
|