Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SYNCHRONY BANK VS KARINE POGOSIAN
On July 24, 2018 an other promissory note/collections case (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/26/2019 | |
July 24, 2019 | Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal | ||
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by SYNCHRONY BANK on 07/24/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by SYNCHRONY BANK as to the entire action |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARINE POGOSIAN (Defendant) |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Robert Schuit; Reason: Inventory Transfer | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Rick Brown in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse | |
July 24, 2018 | Summons - on Complaint | ||
July 24, 2018 | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case | ||
July 24, 2018 | Complaint | ||
July 24, 2018 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
July 24, 2018 | Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) | ||
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740) | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARINE POGOSIAN (Defendant) |
|