Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MARIA BALUYOT
On January 11, 2018 a collections case - purchased debt (charged off consumer debt purchased on or after january 1,2014) (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 11, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 03, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR:
(1) Account Stated g
‘fl
PRAYER AMT: $1,051.66 a
LIMITED
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA BALUYOT (Defendant) |
|
July 22, 2019 | Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal | ||
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Imposition of Sanctions and/or Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 07/23/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/22/2019 | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 01/11/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC as to the entire action |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
April 23, 2019 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Imposition of Sanctions and/or Dismis...) | ||
April 23, 2019 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Imposition of Sanctions and/or Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 04/23/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/23/2019 08:30 AM | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Imposition of Sanctions and/or Dismis...) | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Imposition of Sanctions and/or Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 07/23/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Robert Schuit; Reason: Inventory Transfer | |
March 15, 2019 | Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing | ||
March 15, 2019 | Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail | ||
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA BALUYOT (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2019 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | ||
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Imposition of Sanctions and/or Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 04/23/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/17/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to 01/17/2019; Result Type to Held - Continued | |
February 07, 2018 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA BALUYOT (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/02/2018; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Rick Brown in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/17/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
January 11, 2018 | Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) | ||
January 11, 2018 | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case | ||
January 11, 2018 | Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) | ||
January 11, 2018 | Complaint | ||
January 11, 2018 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
January 11, 2018 | Summons - on Complaint | ||
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA BALUYOT (Defendant) |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Business & Professions Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740) | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|