Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ausencio Campos vs. Home Depot Company
A 47 Small Claims $1,501 - $5,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Judge, Pro Tempore presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 18, 2023
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Judge
Hon. Judge, Pro Tempore
Category
47 Small Claims $1,501 - $5,000
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Name: Travis Pierce, Store Manager |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's claim and Order filed Home Depot-Agent: Lisa Carcione |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC Fee: $15.00-Unserved Defective-Wrong Signature |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim filed | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's claim mailed certified mail Tracking number:7016 3750 0000 3184 0499 |