Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ronald Jackson, JR vs Dominique Mitchell
A Dissolution - Minor Children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge David C. Kalemkarian presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
Dissolution - Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
7 months and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep | |
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to To FLEX for judgment review |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Default shelf w/Judgment w/envelopes |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default As to Dominique Michell |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Acknowledgment and Receipt | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution with Children |