Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Erin Sanchez vs Matthew Sanchez
A Dissolution - Minor Children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Kalemkarian, David presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
Dissolution - Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
8 months and 9 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application/Order for Restoration of Former Name | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX for Ex Parte to Restore Former Name |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Withdraw of Attorney Attorney Withdrawing: Leslie Soley |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep Dissolution |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Marital status ends: 05/28/2019 |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Family Case Management Filing Party Erin Elizabeth Sanchez Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached Clerk: L Garvin Bailiff: A. Rivera Petitioner not present Attorney present: Hunt Respondent not present Other: Judgment has been submitted. No further case status hearings necessary. Hearing currently set 10/8/2019 is vacated. |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Documents Notice of Entry of Judgment- Accepted Pending Review |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Documents Judgment - Accepted Pending Review |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation and Waiver | |
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Documents Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment- Accepted Pending Review |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Documents Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure- Accepted Pending Review |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Tickler: NEJ w/SASE's |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to sent Request for Status Conference to FL Supervisor for Review |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Documents Accepted Pending Review/Signature - Request for Status Conference |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Request for Family Centered Case Resolution Conference |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Case Information - Family Law |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Request for Status or Family Centered Case Resolution Conference sent to shelf |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX for STIP review. (w/out file) |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Old Atty: New Atty: |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Documents (STIP - Accepted Pending Review) |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Old Attny: Pro Se New Attny: Leslie Soley |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response Re Dissolution with Children |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution with Children |