Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Sandra L Granum vs Lance C Granum
A Dissolution - No Children case was filed by Granum, Sandra L, against Granum, Lance C, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge David C. Kalemkarian presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
Dissolution - No Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
4 months and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Box #7 - conformed QDRO |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Unrepresented Party filed by Respondent |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner on behalf of Petitioner |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Documents sent to Box 7 |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Unrepresented Party Filed by Petitioner on behalf of Petitioner |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Family Code Section 2105 Waiver | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation and Waiver | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX: Judgment Review |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Appearance & Response of Employee Benefit Plan |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Served Sandra L. Granum on 10/1/2018. |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan and Order | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Pleading on Joinder-Ben Plan | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Served Respondent on Sept. 6, 2018. |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to: Dissolution of Marriage |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution without Children | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed |