Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Danny Alvarez vs Melissa Alva
A Dissolution - Minor Children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Lisa M. Gamoian presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2018
Last Refreshed
January 05, 2023
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
Dissolution - Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Preliminary & final |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Gamoian Minute Order: See Attached | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Gamoian Minute Order: See Attached | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Hopper, Cindy |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached HRG: 9/18/2019 Judicial Officer: D. Kalemkarian Dept: 202 Clerk: L. Garvin Bailiff: A. Rivera Court Reporter: Not Reported Time: 8:30 am Petitioner present Respondent not present Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 9/9/20 Time: 10:30 a.m Dept: 202 Petitioner is present and has been assisted by a staff from the Self-Help Center. Matter continued for further case status conference. Petitioner to notify the opposing party. |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default entered as to respondent Melissa Alva |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to default to default desk w/envelopes |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution with Children | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act |